Cole v. Warden of Atlanta, USP et al
Plaintiff: James T. Cole
Defendant: Warden of Atlanta, USP and Office of the Regional Director, Mr. Keller
Case Number: 1:2019cv00978
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Supplemental Submission Detailing Additional Evidence by James T. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cmd)
April 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James T. Cole, Warden of Atlanta, USP re #8 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (btql)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to pay within 28 days an initial partial filing fee of $47.00. The Warden of Plaintiff's place of incarceration or the Warden's designee SHALL COLLECT the monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account AND REMIT them to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Service of process SHALL NOT issue until further consideration of Plaintiff's complaint for frivolity. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the Magistrate Judge upon receipt of Plaintiffs $47.00 initial partial filing fee or upon the expiration of the 28-day period noted above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/10/2019. (btql)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Titled MOTION To Implicate Trust Fund Account (Construed by the Court as Application to Proceed IFP) by James T. Cole. (tcc) Modified on 4/10/2019 (btql).
March 29, 2019 Submission of #6 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, #4 Order to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (btql)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by James T. Cole. (btql)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Submission by James T. Cole (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql)
March 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James T. Cole re #4 Order and copy of financial affidavit. (jpa)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within 28 days Plaintiff must either submit the full filing and administrative fees of $400 or sign and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/11/19. (jpa)
March 1, 2019 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by James T. Cole to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (bnw) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (bnw).
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James T. Cole. (bnw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by James T. Cole. (bnw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James T. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Note)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Warden of Atlanta, USP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Atlanta, USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Regional Director, Mr. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?