GSR Markets Limited v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: GSR Markets Limited
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Hugh Austin, Brandon Austin, Valkyrie Group, LLC, Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01005
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF re #44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald GSR Markets Limited's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Contempt Against Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group LLC filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Robbins, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits G & H to Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint by GSR Markets Limited re #76 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Letter to Sellers dated 2-6-2019, #2 Exhibit H - Consent Order)(Robbins, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 1-1-2019, #2 Exhibit B - Private Deed of Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Text Messages, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated 1-7-2019, #5 Exhibit E - McDonald's Email and other correspondence, #6 Exhibit F - Email to Wells Fargo)(Robbins, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC re #75 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jta)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Answer due 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/16/19. (jta)
April 15, 2019 Filing 74 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Response to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClafferty, Michelle)
April 15, 2019 Filing 73 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Valkyrie Group, LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Sharp, Heather)
April 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC re #72 Order, to 4485 Tench Road, Suite 1410, Suwanee, Georgia 30024, as directed. (jta)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re #70 Consent to Withdraw James Ward Howard as Attorney. The Court thus DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Mr. Howard as counsel of record for the McDonald Defendants. The Court NOTIFIES Defendant McDonald Law Group, LLC that a corporation cannot appear pro se and must be represented by counsel. The Court thus DIRECTS Defendant McDonald Law Group, LLC to have counsel (including Defendant McDonald) file a notice of appearance with the Clerk no later than May 2, 2019. The Court DIRECTS Defendant McDonald, on or before May 2, 2019, to either (1) file a notice with the Clerk stating that she intends to proceed pro se in this matter and include her mailing address and telephone number(s), or (2) have counsel (including herself) file a notice of appearance with the Clerk. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions against the McDonald Defendants, including default being entered against them. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to update the docket with the following address for the McDonald Defendants and send a copy of this order to the following address, which was provided to the Court by Mr. Howard: 4485 Tench Road, Suite 1410, Suwanee, Georgia 30024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/11/19. (jta)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Diana McDonald Answer due 5/6/2019; McDonald Law Group LLC Answer due 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/10/19. (jta)
April 10, 2019 Filing 70 Consent MOTION to Withdraw James Ward Howard as Attorneyby Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 69 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , Partially Unopposed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James) Modified on 4/10/2019 to edit text and link to existing document (jta).
April 9, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald , Supplemental filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION Challenging privilege log of the McDonald Defendants #48 Certificate of Service , #44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald as Supplemented (66) filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Support re #44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Robbins, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER of USCA- 11th Circuit re: Writ of Mandamus: Motion for writ of mandamus and motion for writ of prohibition filed by Petitioner Diana McDonald are DENIED. (pjm)
April 5, 2019 Submission of #44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta)
April 5, 2019 Submission of #40 MOTION Limit Deposition and Objection to Videotaping #39 Notice to Take Deposition, #35 Notice to Take Deposition , to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta)
April 5, 2019 Filing 64 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Brandon Austin served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Sharp, Heather)
April 5, 2019 Filing 63 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Hugh Austin served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Sharp, Heather)
April 5, 2019 Filing 62 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Valkyrie Group, LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Sharp, Heather)
April 2, 2019 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Diana McDonald (Second) by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Howard, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Diana McDonald (Second) by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Defendants Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group LLC object to this Court's order requiring in camera review of documents they claim are privileged. (Dkt. #57 .) Defendants also filed a supplemental motion for recusal. (Dkt. #58 .) The Court overrules Defendants' objection and denies their motion. The Court orders Defendants to provide the five documents to the Court for in-camera review on or before Monday, April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/28/2019. (bgt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 58 Supplemental MOTION for Recusal of Judge Brown, MOTION to Disqualify Judge Brown, MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal with Brief In Support by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/OBJECTION to Orders Compelling Violation of Attorney-Client Privilege, re #18 Temporary Restraining Order, #56 Order, #51 Order, and Brief in Support filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James) Modified on 3/28/2019 to edit text to accurately reflect e-filed document and remove double punctuation(jta).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Court ordered Plaintiff to confirm that Defendants Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group, LLC complied completely with the production ordered by the Court. (Dkt. #51 ) Plaintiff states that Defendants have not produced any bank statements past February 28, 2019; any communications with Seth Eschen, Giving Builders, National Financial Services, or AgTex Group, LLC; or any responsive text messages. (Dkt. #55 ) The Court orders these documents produced to Plaintiff by Friday, March 29, 2019. Plaintiff also challenges whether the documents withheld are protected by the attorney-client privilege. Plaintiff makes three arguments for why these communications may not be privileged: (1) Ms. McDonald was acting as an escrow agent and was not providing legal advice; (2) Ms. McDonald has not made any showing that these communications are protected; and (3) the crime-fraud exception may apply to these communications. Based on these reasons, the Court finds an in-camera review appropriate of the communications listed as privileged: (1) Skype message string: McDonald and Alivic representatives, 1/3/19-2/13/19; (2) Skype message string: McDonald and Alivic representatives, 1/3/19-3/8/19; (3) Email message string: McDonald and Alivic representatives, 1/3/19-2/24/19; (4) Email message: Alivic representative to McDonald, 6/6/18; (5) Alivic corporate billing invoice, 1/4/19. The Court orders these documents produced to the Court by Monday, April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/27/19. (jta)
March 26, 2019 Funds Deposited per Order: $ 60,000.00, receipt number GAN100111280 (jpa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Statement Pursuant to Court's #51 Order, by GSR Markets Limited , Regarding McDonald Defendants' Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sharp, Heather) Modified on 3/26/2019 to edit text (jta).
March 25, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION Challenging privilege log of the McDonald Defendants #48 Certificate of Service with Brief In Support by GSR Markets Limited. (Sharp, Heather)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONSENT ORDER REGARDING FUNDS. By consent of counsel for Plaintiff GSR Markets Limited and counsel for Defendants Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group LLC d/b/a Law Offices of Diana McDonald (the McDonald Defendants), The Howard Law Firm, P.C. (Howard Firm) shall deposit in the Courts registry $60,000 of the retainer provided by the McDonald Defendants on or about March 6, 2019. The McDonald Defendants expressly agree to the deposit of $60,000 into the Courts registry. The retainer was paid out of a Fidelity Bank account ending in -0347 which was comprised of GSR Escrowed Funds. (See McDonald Defendants Notice of Attorneys Legal Fee [Dkt. No. #41 .) The deposit shall be made on or before Wednesday March 27, 2019. Upon such deposit, Plaintiff agrees to waive any claim against James Howard and the Howard Firm for the remaining $30,000 of the retainer, which Mr. Howard contends is payment for services rendered to date. The waiver of the claim againstMr. Howard or the Howard Firm shall not waive or release any claims against any of the defendants or any other persons or entities. The monies shall remain in the registry of the Court until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/25/19. c:Financial Office(jta)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ENTERING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Failure to abide by the above Order will subject the party to contempt proceedings in this Court. Plaintiff shall deliver a copy of this Order to Defendants promptly. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/25/19. (jta)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Defendants Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group, LLC fileda Log of Discovery Produced and Withheld #48 , which includes a summary of material produced to Plaintiff GSR Markets Limited and a list of material withheld based on the attorney-client privilege. This production was ordered by the Court in the Temporary Restraining Order(Dkt. #18 ) and at the Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on March 18, 2019 (Dkt. #46 ). The Court directs Plaintiff to confirm to the Court that Defendants may also file a motion to challenge the privilege log so that the Court may make an in camera review of the materials withheld. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/25/19. (jta)
March 25, 2019 Filing 50 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 9, 2019 thru October 25, 2019, by Richard Lance Robbins. (Robbins, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) held on 03/18/2019, before Judge Michael L. Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter, FAPR, RMR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number 404-215-1456. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (jbc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Temporary Restraining Order with Log of Discovery Produced and Withheld by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC.(Howard, James)
March 20, 2019 Funds Deposited per Order: $ 45,080.71, receipt number GAN100111152 (jpa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 47 DEPOSITION of Diana McDonald taken on March 15, 2019 by GSR Markets Limited. (Attachments: #1 McDonald Exhibit 1, #2 McDonald Exhibit 2, #3 McDonald Exhibit 3, #4 McDonald Exhibit 4, #5 McDonald Exhibit 5, #6 McDonald Exhibit 6, #7 McDonald Exhibit 7, #8 McDonald Exhibit 8, #9 McDonald Exhibit 9, #10 McDonald Exhibit 10, #11 McDonald Exhibit 11, #12 McDonald Exhibit 12, #13 McDonald Exhibit 13, #14 McDonald Exhibit 14, #15 McDonald Exhibit 15, #16 McDonald Exhibit 16, #17 McDonald Exhibit 17, #18 McDonald Exhibit 18)(Sharp, Heather) Modified on 3/20/2019 to edit text to remove double wording (jta).
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 4/15/2019 re #46 Hearing. (jta)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER (from 3/18/2019 Hearing) denying Defendants Diana McDonald and McDonald Law Group LLC's #34 Motion to Disqualify Judge/Recusal. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2019. (bgt)
March 18, 2019 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/18/2019. Hearing held to discuss whether to convert the temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. For the reasons stated in the record, the Court issues a preliminary injunction. Counsel shall provide a proposed order to chambers. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall have up to and including 4/15/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Court's other rulings are as reflected in the record. (Court Reporter Jana B.Colter)(jta)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. By agreement of Plaintiff GSR Markets Limited and Defendant Diana McDonald, the Court AUTHORIZES the Clerk of Court to accept funds from Defendant Diana McDonald into the registry of the Court. The funds are from the following accounts: Wells Fargo (number -4169), Fidelity (number -347), Wells Fargo (number -1701), and Bank of America (number -7810). Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2019. c:Financial Office(bgt)
March 17, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Contempt Against Diana McDonald with Brief In Support by GSR Markets Limited. (Robbins, Richard)
March 17, 2019 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Seth A. Eschen by GSR Markets Limited. (Sharp, Heather)
March 17, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT (titled Declaration) of Heather H. Sharp by GSR Markets Limited. (Sharp, Heather) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit text (jta).
March 15, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC of Attorney's Fee (Howard, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION Limit Deposition and Objection to Videotaping #39 Notice to Take Deposition, #35 Notice to Take Deposition by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 39 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Diana McDonald filed by GSR Markets Limited (Sharp, Heather)
March 14, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #18 Temporary Restraining Order and Order Granting Expedited Discovery filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Amendment of #22 Order Granting Expedited Discovery and Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration and Amendment of Order Granting Expedited Discovery. (Dkts. #26 , #29 .) Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/14/19. (jta)
March 14, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (TRO) held on 03/07/2019, before Judge Michael L. Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter, FAPR, RMR, CRR, CRC/Andy Ashley, Telephone number 404-215-1456. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume 2 of Transcript, #2 Notice of Filing Transcript) (jbc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Diana McDonald filed by GSR Markets Limited (Sharp, Heather)
March 14, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Disqualify Judge , MOTION for Recusal , MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James)
March 14, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #18 Temporary Restraining Order and Consent to Extension of Injunctive Relief by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting McDonald Defendants' #30 Motion for One-Day Extension of Time to Produce Expedited Discovery. Defendants DIANA MCDONALD and MCDONALD LAW GROUP LLC shall comply with March 13, 2019 deadlines for production of expedited discovery by March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/14/19. (jta)
March 14, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Amend #18 Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Reconsideration , #29 Supplemental MOTION to Amend #18 Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rena McDonald)(Sharp, Heather)
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 Supplemental MOTION to Amend #18 Temporary Restraining Order , Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. McDonald Law Group LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Robbins, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Diana McDonald served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Robbins, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend #18 Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Reconsideration by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Diana McDonald Answer due 4/15/2019; McDonald Law Group LLC Answer due 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/13/19. (jta)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by GSR Markets Limited to Serve Subpoenas To Bank Of America And Fidelity Bank To Appear And Testify At A Hearing Or Trial In A Civil Action And Produce Documents (Sharp, Heather)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Court STRIKES paragraph 7 from the TRO Order #18 . The Court finds that paragraph 13 of the TRO Order imposes no duty on Wells Fargo. Defendant McDonald can submit client-communications to the Court for an in-camera review on or before Thursday, March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/11/2019. (bgt)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent David Hitson on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hitson, Brent)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a hearing on March 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., to take place before the Honorable Michael L. Brown, in Courtroom 1906, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303. The hearing is to discuss whether to convert the temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. The Court ORDERS Defendant Diana McDonald to appear in person, and with her counsel, at the hearing. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/11/2019. (bgt)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #17 Response (Non-Motion) to Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McClafferty, Michelle)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motions for TRO and Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/8/2019. (bgt)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #7 Order on Motion to Expedite,, #5 Order on Motion for TRO,,, and Proposed Order submitted by Plaintiff filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Howard, James)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Huggins Sharp on behalf of GSR Markets Limited (Sharp, Heather)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn McClafferty on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (McClafferty, Michelle)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #13 Exhibit. (ddm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED Plaintiff's Exhibit #1 from March 7, 2019 hearing held before Judge Brown #12 has been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (ddm) (ddm).
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Preliminary injunction Hearing held on 3/7/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GSR Markets Limited. The Court heard arguments from the parties. Plaintiff called Defendant Diana McDonald for cross-examination over her objection. The Court admitted Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 as confidential and under seal. For the reasons stated in the record, the Court CONTINUES the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 5) up to and including 3/18/2019. Plaintiff to provide the Court with a proposed order on 3/8/2019 Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Jana B. Colter/Andy Ashley)(jpa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION OF VINCENT RUSSO by GSR Markets Limited. (Russo, Vincent)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Ward Howard on behalf of Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC (Howard, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Diana McDonald, McDonald Law Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, Motion for TRO , as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.., Return of Service Executed by GSR Markets Limited. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Robbins, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Expedited Discovery (Dkt. #6 ). The Court ORDERS that on or before Monday, March 11, 2019, Wells Fargo shall produce to GSR Markets statements from the bank account at issue from January 1, 2019, through the present. Plaintiff's other requests for expedited discovery are, for the moment, denied. Failure to abide by this order will subject the party to contempt proceedings in this Court. Plaintiff shall deliver a copy of this order to Defendants promptly. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/6/2019. (bgt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery by GSR Markets Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for TRO. Defendants McDonald, McDonald Law, and Wells Fargo are hereby TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED from disbursing any funds in the Account, or any other account belonging to McDonald or McDonald Law at Wells Fargo, until further order of this Court. The Court waives the requirement for a bond in this matter. Plaintiff is ordered to serve process and all papers on Defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff is further ordered to provide a copy of this order to Defendants as soon as possible. The Court hereby sets this matter for hearing on Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction for 10:00 a.m. on March 7, 2019, in Courtroom 1906, Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW, Atlanta, GA 30303-3309. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/4/2019. (bgt)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
March 4, 2019 Submission of the #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (aaq)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Diana McDonald, Brandon Austin, Hugh Austin, McDonald Law Group LLC, Valkyrie Group, LLC, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Summons MCDONALD LAW GROUP LLC, #2 Summons VALKYRIE GROUP, LLC, #3 Summons BRANDON AUSTIN, #4 Summons HUGH AUSTIN, #5 Summons WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.)(aaq)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with brief in support filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard L. Robbins)(aaq)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by GSR Markets Limited. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8485248) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/4/2019 to edit file date. (aaq).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSR Markets Limited v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brent David Hitson
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valkyrie Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana McDonald
Represented By: James Ward Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald Law Group LLC
Represented By: James Ward Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSR Markets Limited
Represented By: Richard Lance Robbins
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Heather Huggins Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?