Garden World Images Ltd v. WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC
Plaintiff: Garden World Images Ltd
Defendant: WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01035
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Garden World Images Ltd. WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #3 Order, by Joel B. Rothman on behalf of Garden World Images Ltd (Rothman, Joel)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garden World Images Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Floramedia Group BV for Garden World Images Ltd. (Rothman, Joel)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC. (bnp)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Garden World Images Ltd (Rothman, Joel)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/11/2019. (sap)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Garden World Images Ltd. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8490608) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit -2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit -3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garden World Images Ltd v. WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WilsonBrosGardens.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden World Images Ltd
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?