Madhani v. Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.

Plaintiff: Akbar Madhani
Defendant: Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01285
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
2 Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc. of Withdrawal of Steven L. Ferenczy (Ferenczy, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 6/27/19. (ddm)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the parties' #16 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 6/27/19. (ddm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Protective Order)(Heller, Martin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: Service of Defendants Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendant and Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc..(Heller, Martin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Akbar Madhani.(Scott, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories by Akbar Madhani.(Scott, Justin)
June 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-1285-JPB-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: Service of Defendants Initial Disclosures; Defendants First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc..(Heller, Martin)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 9/12/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 5/15/19. (jpa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Akbar Madhani.(Scott, Justin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant by Akbar Madhani.(Scott, Justin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Akbar Madhani.(Scott, Justin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Akbar Madhani. (Scott, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.. (Heller, Martin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/12/2019.(Heller, Martin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Akbar Madhani. Morrow Motor Sales, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Scott, Justin)
March 21, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Akbar Madhani. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Akbar Madhani. (Scott, Justin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.. (tcc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Akbar Madhani. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8527617) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madhani v. Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrow Motor Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ferenczy
Represented By: Martin B. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akbar Madhani
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?