Almanzar v. Kebe et al
Plaintiff: Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar
Defendant: Latasha Transrina Kebe, Latasha Transrina Howard, Starmarie Ebony Jones and Kebe Studios LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01301
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RECERTIFICATION by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Sabbak, Sadeer)
October 20, 2021 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RECERTIFICATION by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Sabbak, Sadeer)
October 20, 2021 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RECERTIFICATION by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Sabbak, Sadeer)
October 14, 2021 Filing 159 Proposed Pretrial Order by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A (Qualification Voir Dire), #2 Attachment B (General Voir Dire), #3 Attachment C (Plaintiff's Factual Summary and Illustrative Law), #4 Attachment D (Defendants' Factual Summary and Illustrative Law), #5 Attachment E (Stipulated Facts), #6 Attachment F (Witness Lists), #7 Attachment G-1 (Plaintiff's Exhibit List and Defendants' Objections), #8 Attachment G-2 (Defendants' Exhibit List and Plaintiff's Objections), #9 Attachment I (Special Verdict Forms), #10 Attachment J (Plaintiff's Deposition Designations))(Moore, Lisa)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TRIAL CALENDAR ORDER: Jury Selection set for 11/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. The Court will not specially set any trial dates and CASES MAY BE CALLED OUT OF ORDER. If a case is not reached on the first date noticed, the case is then automatically rolled over to the next scheduled date/week. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DATES. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/12/21. (ceo)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to file the consolidated pretrial order is hereby extended to October 14, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/6/2021. (cmd)
October 6, 2021 Filing 156 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Pretrial Order by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting the #154 Joint Motion for Extension of Time.The deadline for the parties to file the consolidated pretrial order is hereby extended to October 7, 2021. The deadline for the parties to produce expert reports in accordance with Federal Rule 26(a)(2) is hereby extended to September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/25/2021. (tcc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 154 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Pretrial Order and Produce Expert Reports by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Lisa)
July 26, 2021 Filing 153 AMENDED CIVIL JURY CALENDAR. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry ORDER GRANTING #152 Motion to Continue. The Jury Trial is added to the calendar call commencing on November 9, 2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. This case is a back up to the criminal calendar list; if this case is not called on November 9, it will be called on November 15. SO ORDERED by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/26/2021. (jkl)
July 23, 2021 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Moore, Lisa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 151 AMENDED CIVIL JURY CALENDAR. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Defendant Kebe's assault and IIED claims. [Doc. #92 ]. Consequently, Defendant Kebe's punitive damages and attorneys' fees claims are also dismissed. Additionally, Plaintiff' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's claims. [Doc. #92 ]. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/8/2021. (cmd)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendant Kebe to refile Doc. #117 and the supporting exhibits under seal in accordance with the Court's sealed filing procedure. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/17/2021. (cmd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 TRIAL CALENDAR ORDER: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for Friday, September 10, 2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Attorneys should report at 9:00 a.m. (See calendar for instructions and details) Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 06/15/2021. (bdb)
June 7, 2021 Filing 147 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 8/13/21-8/23/21, 10/14/21-10/15/21, 12/29/21-1/5/22, by Olga Izmaylova. (Izmaylova, Olga)
April 12, 2021 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Recertification of Content re #127 Order by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Sabbak, Sadeer) Modified on 4/13/2021 to edit text and add docket relationship. (cmd)
April 8, 2021 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Taking under advisement #92 Motion for Summary Judgment; Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2021 re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. The Court heard oral argument from counsel via Zoom on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment and will issue an order pending further review. The Court advised parties to be ready for trial by mid-September. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(bdb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's #115 Response in Opposition & Supprting Documents [ECF. 116-120] to #92 Motion for Summary Judgment are deemed timely filed, Nunc Pro Tunc. So ordered during a motion hearing held by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/8/2021. (jkl)
April 5, 2021 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2021 at 09:30 AM on ZOOM - hearing to be reset. (jkl)
April 5, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #133 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Deem Her Response Opposing Summary Judgment Timely Filed, Nunc Pro Tunc re: #118 Notice of Filing, #115 Response in Opposition to Motion, #120 Notice of, #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge William M. Ray II. (jkl)
March 31, 2021 ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS for motion hearing set for 4/5/21 at 9:30 AM: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612376597 Meeting ID: 161 237 6597 Passcode: 1705 1 646 828 7666. (jkl)
March 22, 2021 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (ddm) (ADI)
March 5, 2021 Submission of #133 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Deem Her Response Opposing Summary Judgment Timely Filed, Nunc Pro Tunc re: #118 Notice of Filing, #115 Response in Opposition to Motion, #120 Notice, to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
March 2, 2021 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing Proceedings held on February 3, 2021, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING #131 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/23/2021. (cmd)
February 23, 2021 Filing 140 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 4/5/2021 at 09:30 AM on ZOOM VIDEO before Judge William M. Ray II. Instructions for ZOOM VIDEO will be sent separately from the docket. (cmd)
February 22, 2021 Filing 139 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 02/27/2021 through 03/08/2021, by Lisa Fortune Moore. (Moore, Lisa)
February 18, 2021 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Deem Her Response Opposing Summary Judgment Timely Filed, Nunc Pro Tunc re: #118 Notice of Filing, #115 Response in Opposition to Motion, #120 Notice of filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
February 15, 2021 Filing 137 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by Kebe Studios LLC.(Izmaylova, Olga) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 12, 2021 Submission of #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge William M. Ray II. (cmd)
February 11, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge William M. Ray, II on ZOOM. Instructions will be sent separately from the docket. (cmd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING #123 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/11/2021. (cmd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING #121 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/11/2021. (cmd)
February 11, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Deem Her Response Opposing Summary Judgment Timely Filed, Nunc Pro Tunc re: #118 Notice of Filing, #115 Response in Opposition to Motion, #120 Notice of Filing, #116 Notice of Filing, #117 Notice of Filing, #119 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion for Extension of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc, #2 Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Olga Izmaylova, #3 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Sadeer Sabbak)(Izmaylova, Olga)
February 10, 2021 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Discovery Production by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Sabbak, Sadeer)
February 8, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #129 Reply Brief, with Brief In Support by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
February 8, 2021 Filing 130 NOTICE Of Filing by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar re #129 Reply Brief, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Andrew Pequignot)(Pequignot, William)
February 8, 2021 Filing 129 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement of Material Facts, #2 Response to Kebe's Additional Material Facts)(Pequignot, William) Modified on 2/23/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #141 Order. (cmd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #106 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/4/2021. (cmd)
February 4, 2021 Submission of #106 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #105 Response in Opposition to Motionto District Judge William M. Ray II. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 127 Minute Entry + Docket Entry Order for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/3/21: The Court DENIES #80 Motion to Dismiss & GRANTS #107 Motion to Amend. Kebe Studios LLC is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. The Court rules on the #82 , #84 , & #96 Motions to Compel as detailed within this minute entry. The Court ruled it will not grant attorney's fees to either side and encourages mediation discussions. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(jkl)
February 2, 2021 Filing 126 REPLY BRIEF re #96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
February 1, 2021 Electronic Media Received: (3) CDs re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion (jpk)
January 29, 2021 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Amend Her Pleadings and Deem Her Second Amended Complaint Filed, Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (rvb) (ADI)
January 26, 2021 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #122 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Brief Kebe Brief in Support of Motion to File Opposition Brief Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Kebe Proposed Order to File Opposition Brief Under Seal)(Sabbak, Sadeer)
January 26, 2021 Filing 122 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing DEFENDANT KEBES BRIEF OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sadeer Sabbak, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 11/19 Depo, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 11/30 Depo, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 11/29 Depo)(Sabbak, Sadeer) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #135 Order. (cmd)
January 26, 2021 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #82 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses to Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories , #80 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Kebe Studios LLC as an Impermissibly Added Co-Defendant, #84 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses, and Production, to Requests for Production , #96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents . Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge William M. Ray II. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605597067 Meeting ID: 160 559 7067 Password: 1705 Audio via phone: 1 646 828 7666 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jkl)
January 25, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #118 Notice of Filing, #120 Notice of Filing, #119 Notice of Filing, #116 Notice of Filing, #117 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
January 25, 2021 Filing 120 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #134 Order. (cmd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 119 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #134 Order. (cmd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 118 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3: Excerpts from 11/30 Deposition, #2 Exhibit 4: Excerpts from 11/29 Deposition)(Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #134 Order. (cmd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 117 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion Summary Judgment (Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #134 Order. (cmd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 116 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #115 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Kebe Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Statement of Material Facts Kebe Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 2/11/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #134 Order. (cmd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manual Filing)(Izmaylova, Olga)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING #109 Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. If this Court denies Ms. Kebe's pending motion to dismiss, then Kebe Studios LLC shall have 14 days from the date of this Court's Order to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/19/2021. (tcc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Kebe's #108 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #92 Motion for Summary Judgment through and until January 22, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/19/2021. (tcc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #97 Notice of Filing. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/19/2021. (tcc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #94 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #93 Notice of Filing. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/19/2021. (tcc)
January 18, 2021 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
January 18, 2021 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Kebe Studios LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
January 17, 2021 Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
January 15, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION to Amend by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa F. Moore, #2 Declaration of Sarah M. Matz, #3 Matz Exhibit 1, #4 Matz Exhibit 2, #5 Matz Exhibit 3, #6 Matz Exhibit 4, #7 Matz Exhibit 5, #8 Matz Exhibit 8, #9 Matz Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
January 15, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #105 Response in Opposition to Motion, with Brief In Support by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
January 15, 2021 Filing 105 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Kebe Studios LLC as an Impermissibly Added Co-Defendant filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Matz Exhibit 6, #2 Matz Exhibit 7)(Pequignot, William) Modified on 2/5/2021 to remove "Provisionally" per #128 Order. (cmd)
January 15, 2021 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses, and Production, to Requests for Production , #82 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses to Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa F. Moore)(Pequignot, William)
January 13, 2021 Filing 103 Return of Service Executed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. Kebe Studios LLC served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Pequignot, William)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Ms. Kebe to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents is hereby extended to Monday, January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/13/21. (ah)
January 13, 2021 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
January 6, 2021 Filing 100 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court adds the newly filed Motions to Compel #96 to the previously scheduled hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the Motion to Dismiss #80 and Motions to Compel #82 and #84 in this case for Wednesday, February 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/6/2021. (ah)
January 4, 2021 Remark re #99 Notice of Manual Filing: 1 flash drive received and filed with the Records Clerks. (tmf) Modified on 1/4/2021 to edit text and add doc link(tmf).
December 31, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE Of Manual Filing of Electronic Media by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar (tmf)
December 31, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #97 Notice of Filing,, with Brief In Support by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
December 31, 2020 Filing 97 (SEALED) NOTICE Of Filing by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar re #96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Matz Exhibit 5, #3 Matz Exhibit 6, #4 Matz Exhibit 8, #5 Matz Exhibit 9, #6 Matz Exhibit 11, #7 Matz Exhibit 14, #8 Matz Exhibit 15, #9 Moore Exhibit 1, #10 Moore Exhibit 2, #11 Matz Declaration, #12 Moore Declaration, #13 Pequignot Declaration)(Pequignot, William) Modified on 1/19/2021 (tcc).
December 31, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Manual Filing, #3 Matz Exhibit 1, #4 Matz Exhibit 2, #5 Matz Exhibit 3, #6 Matz Exhibit 4, #7 Matz Exhibit 7, #8 Matz Exhibit 10, #9 Matz Exhibit 12, #10 Matz Exhibit 13, #11 Matz Exhibit 16, #12 Moore Exhibit 3, #13 Moore Exhibit 4, #14 Moore Exhibit 5)(Pequignot, William)
December 31, 2020 Filing 95 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Original Deposition Transcripts by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar (Attachments: #1 11.19.20 Deposition Transcript, #2 11.29.20 Deposition Transcript, #3 11.30.20 Deposition Transcript)(Pequignot, William)
December 30, 2020 Electronic Media received re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment (attachment 5 - exhibit E) (ah)
December 30, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #93 Notice of Filing, by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
December 30, 2020 Filing 93 (SEALED) NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit D - Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit G - Declaration)(Pequignot, William) Modified on 1/19/2021 (tcc).
December 30, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A - Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Manual Filing, #6 Exhibit F - Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit H - Discovery Responses, #8 Exhibit I - Discovery Responses)(Pequignot, William) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.
December 28, 2020 Filing 91 ANSWER to #79 Counterclaim by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Moore, Lisa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for Plaintiff to respond are hereby extended to Friday, January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/23/2020. (ah)
December 22, 2020 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Pending Motions by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the initial pleadings and supporting documents identified within under seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/22/2020. (ah)
December 22, 2020 Filing 87 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court adds the newly filed Motions to Compel #82 and #84 to the previously scheduled hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the Motion to Dismiss #80 in this case for Wednesday, February 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/22/2020. (ah)
December 21, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #83 Notice of Filing,,,, #85 Notice of Filing,,,, with Brief In Support by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Brief In support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
December 21, 2020 Filing 85 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #84 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses, and Production, to Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Ms. Kebes Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiffs Responses to Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit 3: Letter detailing the deficiencies in Plaintiffs Responses, and production, to Ms. Kebes Requests for Production, #4 Exhibit 4: Email to Plaintiffs counsel inquiring about the overdue production, #5 Exhibit 5: Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production, #6 Exhibit 6: Discovery dispute letter to Ms. Lundy, #7 Exhibit 7: Chart of Plaintiffs discovery deficiencies, #8 Exhibit 8: Email to Plaintiff's Counsel of Plaintiffs discovery deficiencies chart, #9 Exhibit 9: Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production, #10 Exhibit 10: Notice to Preserve, #11 Exhibit 11: Facebook, Inc.s Reply)(Izmaylova, Olga) Modified to edit text on 12/22/2020 (ah).
December 21, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses, and Production, to Requests for Production by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga)
December 21, 2020 Filing 83 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supporting Documents for Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe re #82 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses to Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Ms. Kebes First Continuing Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiffs Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3: Letter detailing the deficiencies in Plaintiffs Responses to Ms. Kebes First Continuing Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4: Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5: Ms. Kebe discovery dispute letter to Ms. Lundy, #6 Exhibit 6: Chart of Plaintiffs discovery deficiencies, #7 Exhibit 7: Email to Plaintiff's Counsel of Plaintiffs discovery deficiencies chart, #8 Exhibit 8: Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit 9: Deposition Subpoena for Rashad Haughton, #10 Exhibit 10: Document subpoena for Rashad Haughton)(Izmaylova, Olga) Modified to edit text on 12/22/2020 (ah).
December 21, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Responses to Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga)
December 18, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court schedules a hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the pending Motion to Dismiss #80 in this case for Wednesday, February 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/18/2020. (ah)
December 15, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Kebe Studios LLC as an Impermissibly Added Co-Defendant by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga)
December 13, 2020 Filing 79 Defendant Kebe's ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint , Second COUNTERCLAIM against Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar with Jury Demand by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to File an Answer and affirmative defenses to the Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/10/2020. (ah)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Filing 76 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kebe Studios LLC. (ah)
December 7, 2020 Filing 75 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar for Defendant Kebe Studios LLC (Pequignot, William)
December 7, 2020 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
December 7, 2020 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
December 7, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Kebe's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Second Amended Counterclaims by Latasha Transrina Kebe, Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 30, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Set of Requests for Admission by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
November 29, 2020 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Kebe's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 29, 2020 Filing 69 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Latasha Transrina Kebe and Kebe Studios LLC with Jury Demand filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Kebe's Consent to Amendment (Paragraph 11))(Moore, Lisa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/31/2021 to add Defendant (jkl).
November 29, 2020 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
November 29, 2020 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
November 29, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Kebe's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 23, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Count I of Amended Counterclaims filed by Latasha Transrina Kebe (Izmaylova, Olga)
November 23, 2020 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 23, 2020 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 18, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 15, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
October 30, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
October 30, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Kebe's First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
October 29, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Kebe's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court is extending all deadlines for an additional thirty (30) days from their expiration. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/27/2020. (ah)
October 16, 2020 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Izmaylova, Olga)
October 6, 2020 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Requests for Admission by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Moore, Lisa)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/17/2020. (ah)
September 15, 2020 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Moore, Lisa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
August 18, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Discovery Responses by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Moore, Lisa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Discovery Responses by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Moore, Lisa)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for all parties to complete discovery and file discovery motions, including but not limited to motions to compel, is hereby extended to October 30, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/13/2020. (ah)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (rvb) (ADI)
July 10, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Lisa)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for all parties to complete discovery and file discovery motions, including but not limited to motions to compel, is hereby extended to August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/3/2020. (ah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Motions for Summary Judgment by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for all parties to complete discovery and file discovery motions, including but not limited to motions to compel, is extended to June 30, 2020. The deadline to file motions for summary judgment is July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/9/2020. (ah)
April 9, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Matz, Sarah) Modified to edit text on 4/10/2020 (ah).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/25/20. (rlb)
February 9, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Kebe's First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
February 9, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Kebe's First Continuing Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
December 10, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 7, 2019, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter, Wynette C. Blathers. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (wxb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ms. Kebe's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Requests for Production by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ms. Kebe's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 16, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
November 16, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ms. Kebe's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Matz, Sarah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendant Latasha Transrina Kebe #13 is DENIED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/9/19. (rlb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2019. Plaintiff's counsel argued their Motion to Dismiss Defendant's CounterClaims. Defense presented their argument and asked that alternatively, they be allowed to amend their counterclaims to be more specific. The Court will not dismiss the counterclaims and encourages settlement discussions. The Court stated if questions arise as to deposition locations, it should be in Atlanta. The parties are directed to diligently pursue discovery. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(rlb)
October 5, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Set of Interrogatories by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
October 5, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Requests for Production of Documents by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
September 10, 2019 Submission of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Matz, Sarah)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gary P. Adelman. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/3/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
September 3, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary P. Adelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8897323). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Gary Philip Adelman added appearing on behalf of Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar (pmb)
September 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Gary P. Adelman re #21 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary P. Adelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8897323). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 First Initial Disclosures by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: The parties failed to file their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan as required by the Local Rules. The parties shall file, on or before August 27, 2019, their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. See LR 41.3(A)(2), NDGa. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the Court if the parties fail to comply with this order. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 8/13/19. (rlb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on #13 Motion to Dismiss for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M Ray II. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 8/13/19. (rlb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT LATASHA TRANSRINA KEBE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Sarah M. Matz, #3 Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit text (rlb).
July 7, 2019 Filing 12 Latasha Kebe's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar with Jury Demand by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar.(Pequignot, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sarah M. Matz. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/28/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
May 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sarah M. Matz re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Almanzar shall have through and including June 12, 2019 to amend her complaint. Kebe shall have through and including July 12, 2019 to file her answer to the amended complaint. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Kebe's counterclaim, the deadline to file the parties' initial disclosures and the joint preliminary report and discovery plan, and the date that discovery is scheduled to commence shall be extended (see order for details). Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/24/19. (rlb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
May 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah M. Matz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8675670). Attorney Sarah M. Matz added appearing on behalf of Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar (pmb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah M. Matz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8675670)by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Pequignot, William)
May 9, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, #6 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Izmaylova, Olga) Modified on 5/9/2019 to edit text (rlb).
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 10/7/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar with Jury Demand by Latasha Transrina Kebe.(Izmaylova, Olga) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. Latasha Transrina Kebe served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Moore, Lisa)
March 25, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Moore, Lisa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Starmarie Ebony Jones, Latasha Transrina Kebe. (Attachments: #1 Summons Starmarie Jones)(tmf)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8529725) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almanzar v. Kebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Transrina Kebe
Represented By: Olga Izmaylova
Represented By: Sadeer Sabbak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Transrina Howard
Represented By: Olga Izmaylova
Represented By: Sadeer Sabbak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starmarie Ebony Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kebe Studios LLC
Represented By: Sadeer Sabbak
Represented By: Olga Izmaylova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar
Represented By: Lisa Fortune Moore
Represented By: William Andrew Pequignot
Represented By: Gary P. Adelman
Represented By: Sarah M. Matz
Represented By: Gary Philip Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?