CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Progress Rail Services Corporation

Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Progress Rail Services Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01410
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan submitted by the parties, the court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as stated in the completed form [Doc. No. 13] except as herein modified. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (tcc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Ford, Sara)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission of Matthew John Haskins Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application For Admission of Christopher Jordan Merrick Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew John Haskins Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John Lowell McKinley, Jr. added appearing on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (jkm)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Jordan Merrick Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John Lowell McKinley, Jr. added appearing on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (jkm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew John Haskins Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McKinley, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Jordan Merrick Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McKinley, John)
June 12, 2019 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew John Haskins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8712305). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
June 12, 2019 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Jordan Merrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8712173). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew John Haskins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8712305). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McKinley, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Jordan Merrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8712173). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McKinley, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Ford, Sara)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Progress Rail Services Corporation. Discovery ends on 10/31/2019.(Ford, Sara) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Defendant's response shall be due on or before June 3, 2019. Entered by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (acm)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Ford, Sara)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Progress Rail Services Corporation. (tmf)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (tmf)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8545308) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Progress Rail Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Rail Services Corporation
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Anne M. Landrum
Represented By: John Lowell McKinley, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Jordan Merrick
Represented By: Matthew John Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?