Sandi v. Quick
Plaintiff: Carlos Sandi
Defendant: Susan Quick
Case Number: 1:2019cv01602
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Specifically Respond to Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint, by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #11 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice,with Brief In Support by Susan Quick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Dell, Justin) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit event and text (tmf).
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice,with Brief In Support by Susan Quick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Dell, Justin) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit event and text (tmf).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2019. (tmf)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Susan Quickwith Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi.(Williams, Odis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 10/15/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Carlos Sandi with Jury Demand by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Carlos Sandi. Susan Quick served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Williams, Odis)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/11/2019. (btql)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carlos Sandi (Williams, Odis)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Susan Quick. (eop)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8568332) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandi v. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Sandi
Represented By: Odis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Quick
Represented By: Nicholas Booth
Represented By: Justin B. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?