J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Johnson
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Sha'Nod A. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01808
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Submission of #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sha'nod A. Johnson, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sha'nod A. Johnson with Brief In Support by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald D. Reemsnyder in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment, #2 Memorandum in Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 4, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Sha'Nod A. Johnson. (dob)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Sha'Nod A. Johnson served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (tcc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sha'Nod A. Johnson. (tcc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8612873) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sha'Nod A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?