J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Huynh
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Hoang Huynh
Case Number: 1:2019cv01889
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Hoang Huynh (rlb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Hoang Huynh served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hoang Huynh. (rlb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. for Hoang Huynh (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. re #4 Return of Service Executed Withdrawal (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Hoang Huynh served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
April 29, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (tcc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hoang Huynh. (tcc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8622576) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoang Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?