Williams v. Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams
Defendant: Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01914
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support)(Boehm, Edward)
May 3, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Williams. Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Scott, Justin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Williams. (Scott, Justin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc. (bnw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Williams.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8625224) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacred Journey Hospice, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Joseph Myers Goerdt
Represented By: Edward N. Boehm, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?