Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Glickauf et al
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company and Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M. Darroch and Stephanie Glickauf
Petitioner: National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01967
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE by Clarendon National Insurance Company Notice of Subpoenas To Produce (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Subpoena, #3 Subpoena)(Brown, Rickman)
June 20, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Clarendon National Insurance Company Notice of Objection To Order To Transfer Venue (Brown, Rickman)
June 20, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance for pro hac attorney JennaE. Settino by Rickman P. Brown on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (Brown, Rickman) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit text to reflect correct attorney (jta).
June 20, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance for pro hac attorney George D. Yaron by Rickman P. Brown on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (Brown, Rickman) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit text to reflect correct attorney (jta).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only). Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. #86 ). Section (l) of the Court's Standing Regarding Civil Litigation requires that "[t]he parties... must submit discovery disputes to the Court before formal motions to compel... are filed." (Dkt. #73 at 5.) The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Compel for violation of the Standing Order. The parties shall comply with the Court's Standing Order regarding the discovery dispute process, which begins by the filing of a Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/19/2019. (bgt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Compel Discovery with Brief In Support by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel)(Frisch, Eric) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove double wording (jta).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #83 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George Dimitiri Yaron; and granting #84 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jenna Eve Settino. (SDS) Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/12/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(sxs)
June 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #83 APPLICATION for Admission of George Dimitri Yaron Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8709458). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Attorney George D. Yaron added appearing on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (cdg)
June 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #84 APPLICATION for Admission of Jenna Eve Settino Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8709474). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Attorney Jenna E. Settino added appearing on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (cdg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Brown, Rickman)
June 5, 2019 Filing 84 APPLICATION for Admission of Jenna Eve Settino Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8709474). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brown, Rickman)
June 5, 2019 Filing 83 APPLICATION for Admission of George Dimitri Yaron Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8709458). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brown, Rickman)
June 5, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Rickman P. Brown on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brown, Rickman)
May 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Michael Theodore McConnell re #81 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
May 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Walter Nicholas Houghtaling re #80 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Theodore McConnell. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/22/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Walter Nicholas Houghtaling. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/22/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
May 21, 2019 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants' Third Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP.(Frisch, Eric)
May 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #76 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Theodore McConnell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8670203). Attorney Michael T. McConnell added appearing on behalf of Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP (cdg)
May 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #77 APPLICATION for Admission of Walter Nicholas Houghtaling Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8670220). Attorney Walter N. Houghtaling added appearing on behalf of Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP (cdg)
May 21, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #78 Response (Non-Motion). PDF reflects heading and case number from case in USDC District of Colorado. (jta)
May 20, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE re #75 Order, Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection filed by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit text (jta).
May 17, 2019 Filing 77 APPLICATION for Admission of Walter Nicholas Houghtaling Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8670220)by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 76 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Theodore McConnell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8670203)by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Todd Evan Jaworsky re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Walter N. Houghtaling re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Ross W. Pulkrabek re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Michael T. McConnell re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Jenna E. Settino re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney George D. Yaron re #75 Order. (jta)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: This matter was transferred from the United States District Court for the District of Colorado to this Court on May 2, 2019. (Dkt. #71 .) A number of attorneys listed on the docket are not members of the bar in the Northern District of Georgia. The Court, thus, ORDERS the following attorneys, on or before June 6, 2019, to (1) become admitted members of the bar of the Northern District of Georgia or (2) submit their applications for admission pro hac vice in this Court: George D. Yaron Jenna E. Settino Ross W. Pulkrabek Michael T. McConnell Walter N. Houghtaling Todd Evan Jaworsky The Court will strike the appearance of any attorney who does not comply with this order. The Court further ORDERS Mr. Jaworsky to file, on or before June 13, 2019, his notice of appearance on the docket on behalf of National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc., if he intends to remain as counsel of record on their behalves. The Court will strike the appearance of Mr. Jaworsky if he fails to file his appearance on the docket. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/16/19. (jta)
May 14, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephanie Glickauf.(Frisch, Eric)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 2, 2019 Filing 72 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-02549. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #36 Motion To Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/1/19.(nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Walter N. Houghtaling on behalf of Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLPAttorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Houghtaling, Walter) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service PLAINTIFF CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 3/28/2019, to file a Motion to Quash Defendants' subpoenas or other related motion if necessary. Counsel are reminded that all motions seeking an extension of time must comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) as future noncompliance may result in this court striking the motion without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/14/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM regarding #65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/14/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 66 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES filed by attorney George D. Yaron. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Non-parties National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc. shall respond to Defendants' subpoenas on or before 4/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/13/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM regarding #62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoenas filed by National Claims Services, Inc., Venture Underwriters, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/13/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoenas by Movants National Claims Services, Inc., Venture Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jaworsky, Todd) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Dessel Katz on behalf of Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLPAttorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Katz, Amy) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/19/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/14/2019. Defendants' Motion to Stay #38 is DENIED. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Designation of NonParties at Fault by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER: Before this court are two Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants. Given the procedural posture of this matter, and to make briefing on the Motions to Dismiss more cohesive for both this court and the presiding judge, the Honorable Christine M. Arguello, this court STRIKES #35 Motion to Dismiss and #51 Motion to Dismiss in lieu of a consolidated Motion that combines both Motions to Dismiss, but does not raise any new, amended, and/or modified arguments. Defendants shall file this consolidated Motion to Dismiss on or before Friday, 2/15/2019. Plaintiff shall then file a consolidated Response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 3/1/2019, and Defendants shall file their Reply on or before 3/8/2019. No extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/13/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM regarding #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response in Support of #35 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Frisch, Eric) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response In Support of #36 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1391 and 1406 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED ON ISSUES TRIABLE TO JURY against All Defendants, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint #46 . The court construes the Motion as an amendment by consent under Local Rule 15.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Plaintiff shall docket the Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 1/30/2019. Furthermore, this court will consider the pending Motions to Dismiss [ #35 , #36 ] as aimed towards the Second Amended Complaint unless otherwise directed by Defendants. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/29/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM regarding #46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/29/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #10 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #11 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #12 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #13 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #14 Exhibit D - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #15 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #16 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #17 Exhibit G - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #18 Exhibit H - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #19 Exhibit I - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #20 Exhibit J - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #21 Exhibit K - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #22 Exhibit L - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #23 Exhibit M - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 (b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery UNDER FED R. CIV. P. 26(c)(1) filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER re: #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Plaintiff shall file its Response on or before 1/22/2019; Defendants' Reply, if any, is due on or before 1/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. Motion for Protective Order #32 is GRANTED; and A Protective Order, consistent with this Order, is ENTERED concurrently withthis Order. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM regarding #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch, #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to designate non-parties at fault is hereby EXTENDED to February 15, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM regarding #30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Nonparty Deadline filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Nonparty Deadline by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/12/2018. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 9/30/2019. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 10/30/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ross Whiting Pulkrabek on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company, Companion Specialty Insurance CompanyAttorney Ross Whiting Pulkrabek added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Ross Whiting Pulkrabek added to party Companion Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Pulkrabek, Ross) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint #22 . The court construes the Motion as an amendment by consent under Local Rule 15.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Plaintiff shall docket the First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 12.12.2019. Also in the Motion is a stipulation that Defendant has thirty days to file a responsive pleading [Id. at 2]. The Court construes this as the parties' one stipulated extension of time under Local Rule 6.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Defendant shall have thirty days from the filing of the First Amended Complaint to Answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12.9.2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/7/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E to Amended Complaint, #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt 1 Amended Complaint Strike Through/underline, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Amended Complaint)(Settino, Jenna) Modified on 12/7/2018 to note that this document was re-filed as doc #22 (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Jenna E. Settino on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance CompanyAttorney Jenna E. Settino added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Jeffrey Frisch on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/18 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Robert M. Darroch, #2 Summons as to Stephanie Glickauf) (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/9/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02549-CMA. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this civil action be reassigned. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to STEPHANIE GLICKAUF by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to ROBERT M. DARROCH by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to GOODMAN MCGUFFEY, LLP by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, All parties must be listed on the caption of the Summons. The Summons provided only list the first Plaintiff. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Clarendon National Insurance Company for Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance OF COUNSEL by George D. Yaron on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6329282)Attorney George D. Yaron added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons All Defendants, #9 Summons Summons of Robert M. Darroch, #10 Summons Summons of Goodman McGuffey LLP, #11 Summons Summons of Stephanie Glickauf)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Glickauf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman McGuffey, LLP
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Darroch
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Glickauf
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jenna E. Settino
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Ross W. Pulkrabek
Represented By: Rickman P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jenna E. Settino
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Ross W. Pulkrabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Evan Jaworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Venture Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Evan Jaworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?