Cooper v. Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Garth Cooper
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Commissioner of Internal Revenue and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv02056
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Internal Revenue Service served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Department of the Treasury served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Commissioner of Internal Revenue served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of the Treasury. (tcc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (tcc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (tcc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Garth Cooper. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 112353) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?