State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv02085
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #3 Return of Service Executed: Answer due date added. (sap)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States of America served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Parnell, Ronald) Modified on 6/11/2019 (sap).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America through Attorney General. (bdb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8647072) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?