Southern Surplus Inc. et al v. Westfield Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Southern Surplus and Supply, LLC and Southern Surplus Inc.
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02133
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Def's Witness List, #2 Attachment B - Def's Expert Witness List, #3 Attachment C - Def.'s Exhibit List, #4 Attachment E - Insurance Policy)(Mull, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to conclude on February 15, 2020. As this is twice the time anticipated by the Local Rules for discovery in litigation of this nature, no further extension will be permitted. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before March 16, 2020. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/24/2019. (rjs)
June 16, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Mull, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Mull, Eric) Modified on 6/11/2019 (rjs).
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Surplus Inc., Southern Surplus and Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Huggins, J.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Mull, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Westfield Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/15/2019.(Mull, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Westfield Insurance Company. (bdb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8653071) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Surplus Inc. et al v. Westfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Surplus and Supply, LLC
Represented By: J. Remington Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Surplus Inc.
Represented By: J. Remington Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Rosson Mull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?