George v. HarperCollins Publishers, LLC

Plaintiff: Grace I. George
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02227
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, HarperCollins Publishers, LLC Answer due 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/10/2019. (tcc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HarperCollins Publishers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fink, Benjamin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/29/19, 7/30/19, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, HarperCollins Publishers, LLC Answer due 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (tcc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Grace I. George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Okonkwo, Cyprian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/5/19, 7/8/19, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HarperCollins Publishers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fink, Benjamin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Grace I. George. HarperCollins Publishers, LLC waiver mailed on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (eop)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to HarperCollins Publishers, LLC. (eop)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Grace I. George. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8665251) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. HarperCollins Publishers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace I. George
Represented By: Cyprian Tee Okonkwo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin I. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?