ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02228
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Joint Motion to Stay and Administratively Close Action. The Parties are ORDERED to provide a status report to the Court NO LATER THAN November 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/2/2019. (bnp)
July 2, 2019 Submission of #56 Joint MOTION to Stay and Administratively Close Action to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Stay and Administratively Close Action by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Andres, Lucille)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #53 , #54 and #55 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 06/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #55 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew G. Hunt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725381). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Andrew G. Hunt added appearing on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (pmb)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #54 APPLICATION for Admission of Raymond E. Mack Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725332). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Raymond E. Mack added appearing on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (pmb)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #53 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick A. Hughes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725309). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Patrick A. Hughes added appearing on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (pmb)
June 19, 2019 RETURN of #52 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew G. Hunt Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney. (pmb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 55 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew G. Hunt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725381). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Allstate Insurance Company. (Protentis, Nick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 54 APPLICATION for Admission of Raymond E. Mack Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725332). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Allstate Insurance Company. (Protentis, Nick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick A. Hughes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8725309). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Allstate Insurance Company. (Protentis, Nick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew G. Hunt Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Allstate Insurance Company. (Protentis, Nick) Modified on 6/13/2019 to edit docket text (bnp).
June 12, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick T. Protentis on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Protentis, Nick)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucille Will Andres on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Andres, Lucille)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Weathersby on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Weathersby, James)
May 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick A. Hughes, attorney for Allstate Insurance Company, and Cheryl M. Nicolson, attorney for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. re #48 Standing Order. (bnp)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/20/2019. (bnp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00699. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE OF 4/25/2019 THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/25/2019. 4/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF 4/9/2019 THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ECF NO. 35, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON 4/9/19. 4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION re #40 Amended Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 41 Letter to Judge Leeson showing cause re subject matter jurisdiction by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/9/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 40 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF 4/5/2019 THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO. 33, IS GRANTED. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION, SEE ECF NO. 33, IN A SEPARATE DOCUMENT AS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE WRITTEN CORRESPONDENCE IN LETTER FORM TO THE COURT TO SHOW CAUSE THAT THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THE FOURTH PROPERTY SUBROGATION CLAIM ON OR BEFORE APRIL 8, 2019 AT 12:00PM. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2019 AT 5:00PM. THE PERTIES JOINT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE SCHEDULING DEADLINES IN THE COURT'S JANUARY 9, 2019 ORDER IS GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE FOR THE COMPLETION OF ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDD TO APRIL 26, 2019; THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO APRIL 26, 2019; THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO MAY 13, 2019; AND ALL OTHER DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THIS COURT'S ORDER DATE JANUARY 9, 2019, ECF NO 26, REMAIN IN EFFECT. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., ON 4/5/2019. 4/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Opposition re #34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Counterstatement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 3/26/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Opposition re #33 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 3/25/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 32 FILED IN ERROR (DT) (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. A Telephonic Pretrial Conference was held on 2/28/2019. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/30/2019 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 28, 2019 (INSTEAD OF MONDAY, FEBRUARY 11, 2019) AT 2:30PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. THE COURT DIRECTS PATRICK A. HUGHES, ESQUIRE TO INITIATE THE CALL. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/30/2019. 1/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/15/2019 THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MAY 30, 2019 AT 9:30AM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/15/2019. 1/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/15/2019 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 11, 2019 AT 2:30PM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/15/2019. 1/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF 1/9/2019 THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER APRIL 8, 2019. ETC. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AND APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/9/2019. 1/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: OF 1/9/2019 DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF ALL FACT DISCOVERY APRIL 8, 2019; ETC. DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, 2019. ETC. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/5/2019 04:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR. ETC. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/10/2019 09:00 AM OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/9/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. Pretrial Conference was held on 1/8/19. (DT) Modified on 1/10/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 8, 2019, AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, APPENDIX A, JURY TRIAL DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF 10/3/2018 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER AND OPINION ISSUED AUGUST 3, 2018, ECF NOS. 16 AND 17, THE COURT'S OPINION ISSUED SIMULTANEOUSLY WITH THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO JOIN AND CONSOLIDATE, ECF NO. 18, AND DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, ECF NO. 19, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, ECF NO. 19, IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. A. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 1 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. ETC. B. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 2 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 3 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS GRANTED. ANY RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AS TO QUESTION 2 SHALL MEET THE FOLLOWING REQUIREMENTS: SUCH MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5:00PM, OCTOBER 12, 2018. ETC. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR CLAIMS "WWW", "XXX", AND "BBB" NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 19, 2018. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON. 10/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 OPINION OF 10/3/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. 10/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative MOTION to Join and Consolidate filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative MOTION to Join and Consolidate re #17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service, Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 8/20/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 8/17/2018. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 17 OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SEVER AND DISMISS, ECF NO. 9, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER CLAIMS "www", "xxx", and "bbbb", AND DIRECTS PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR THESE CLAIMS NO LATER THAN AUGUST 17, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/3/18. 8/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SEVER AND DISMISS, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A SEPARATE ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/3/18. 8/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction -- Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 6/15/2018 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SEVER AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED, AND THE COURT WILL CONSIDER THE SUR-REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/12/18. 4/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST for Leave to File SurReply filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 SurReply, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/13/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 4/10/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIEF AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/3/2018 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service and Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA LYNN YEMMA on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. with Certificate of Service(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERYL M. NICOLSON on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. with Certificate of Service(NICOLSON, CHERYL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Electrolux Home Products, Inc by Certified Mail on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 3/5/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW G. HUNT on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demanded and Certificate of Service(HUNT, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demanded and Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/20/18. 2/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/16/18 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 173655.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Weathersby
Represented By: Lucille Will Andres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond E. Mack
Represented By: Nick T. Protentis
Represented By: Patrick A. Hughes
Represented By: Andrew G. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?