D.J. v. Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: D.J.
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta, Columbia Residential, LLC and Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02232
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Columbia Residential, LLC, Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kimberly Vanjohnson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Aaron Lawrence, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Erika Parks, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Mario D. Breedlove)(Breedlove, Mario) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit event selected (dob).
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Brief for Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex I - 2019-06-03 Transcript of testimony from Dorothy Adike, #2 Exhibit Ex J - HUD-DOJ Joint Statement 5-2004)(Carder, Anne) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit event selected (dob).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting Evidentiary Hearing for 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/19/2019. (dob)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #3 COMPLAINT by Columbia Residential, LLC, Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P.. Discovery ends on 11/12/2019.(Breedlove, Mario) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (TRO) held on 06/03/2019, before Judge Michael L. Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter, FAPR, RMR, CRR, CRC. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (jbc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/17/2019 with time and location to be determined before Judge Michael L. Brown to consider whether to convert the temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/10/2019. (dob)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order 2019-06-07 Proposed Order Continuing Date of PI Hearing and Briefing Schedule)(Smith, Wingo)
June 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. (bgt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. (Dkt. 5.) Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 and pending a further hearing on a renewed motion for a preliminary injunction, the Court ENJOINS and RESTRAINS Defendants Columbia from pursuing a lease termination or eviction against Plaintiff for a period of fourteen days. The Court ORDERS that any violation of the term(s) of this order will be punishable by contempt and other appropriate relief that this Court finds just and proper. The Court sets an evidentiary hearing on June 17, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., to consider whether to convert this temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. The Court instructs the parties to provide additional evidence and caselaw addressing the specific facts in this case, including the potential risk Plaintiff may pose to other residents. The parties should file their briefs with the Court no later than 5:00 P.M. on June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/5/2019. (bgt)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 25, 2019-July 2, 2019, by David E. Langford. (Langford, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2019 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by D.J., #4 MOTION for Permission to Proceed Anonymously filed by D.J. Argument made by both parties. Plaintiff presented Dorothy Adike as a witness. The Court GRANTED a temporary restraining order for fourteen (14) days. The Court will hold an additional hearing on the preliminary injunction request on June 17, 2019. The parties shall brief, no later than 5:00 PM EDT on June 13, 2019, the issues addressed by the Court. A written order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(dob)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Permission to Proceed Anonymously. Plaintiff shall be permitted to proceed in this case by the initials "D.J." Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/3/2019. (bgt)
June 2, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Columbia Residential, LLC, Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P.. (Breedlove, Mario)
June 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Damian Breedlove on behalf of Columbia Residential, LLC, Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P. (Breedlove, Mario)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta filed by D.J.. (Smith, Wingo)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit filed by Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PBRA Agreement Between Defendants AHA and Columbia at Sylvan Hills)(Langford, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by D.J.. Columbia Residential, LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Smith, Wingo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by D.J.. Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Smith, Wingo)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/24/2019. (dob)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Langford on behalf of Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta (Langford, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta. Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta waiver mailed on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Langford, David)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Columbia Residential, LLC. (cmd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P. (cmd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta. (cmd)
May 17, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Permission to Proceed Anonymously to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (cmd)
May 17, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (cmd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.J. (cmd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by D.J. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bette Brotherton, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Plaintiff (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Anne Carder, #5 Exhibit D - 2019-04-06 Notice of Lease Termination and Demand for Possession (Redacted), #6 Exhibit E - 2018-05-31 Informal Review Decision (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F - 2018-09-15 Letter to Mario Breedlove (Redacted), #8 Exhibit G - 2019-04-11 Letter from Mario Breedlove denying accommodation request (Redacted), #9 Exhibit H - 2019-04-22 Letter to Mario Breedlove (Redacted))(cmd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Permission to Proceed Anonymously by D.J. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(cmd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by D.J. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 5/16/2019. (cmd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by D.J. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Anonymously, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed Anonymously, #4 Proposed Order to Proceed Anonymously, #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bette Brotherton, #8 Exhibit B - Declaration of Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit C - Declaration of Anne Carder, #10 Exhibit D - Notice of Lease Termination and Demand for Possession, #11 Exhibit E - Informal Review Decision, #12 Exhibit F - Letter to Mario Breedlove, #13 Exhibit G - Letter from Mario Breedlove, #14 Exhibit H - Letter to Mario Breedlove, #15 Certificate of Interested Persons, #16 Summons Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta, #17 Summons Columbia House at Sylvan Hills, #18 Summons Columbia Residential, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.J. v. Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Atlanta
Represented By: David E. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Residential, LLC
Represented By: Mario Damian Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia at Sylvan Hills, L.P.
Represented By: Mario Damian Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J.
Represented By: Charles Richardson Bliss
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Carder
Represented By: Miriam Fisher Gutman
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Represented By: Margaret Lynne Kinnear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?