Acu-Sense Technology, Inc. v. U. S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Petitioner: Leshon Stewart
Appellee: U. S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Appellant: Acu-Sense Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02530
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira)
June 18, 2019 Received paper record re #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal. (bdb)
June 4, 2019 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
June 4, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, titled, Request for Time to Pay Filing Fee, (Motion included in #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal) by Leshon Stewart. (eop)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 19-54970-SMS, filed by Leshon Stewart. Notice of Appeal filed 5/30/19 from Order entered 5/17/19 by Appellant Acu-Sense Technology, Inc.. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 24 - Notice of Appeal, #2 Doc. 16 - Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #4 -CORRECT PDF -Main Document -Submission Sheet-) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acu-Sense Technology, Inc. v. U. S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U. S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Acu-Sense Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leshon Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?