CCA and B, LLC v. Air11 et al
Plaintiff: CCA and B, LLC
Defendant: Jinzhai County Blossom Import & Export Trading Co., Ltd., lovehome666, Elfdoll, Air11, Fortnite2018, Yiwu Lollipop-Professional Garment Factory, Sunny_baby1, liangjingjing_kitche, Baby_mart8, BABEENI VIETNAM COMPANY LIMITED, Water2018, B2b_life, OuMeiDa Toy Store, Luckypets, liangjingjing_watch, Dongguan Qianqian Apparel Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Busi-Booming Arts&Gifts Company Ltd., Kids_dress, Liangjingjing_no3, China_zy, Globalhouse, Dongguan Jisen Fashion Co., Ltd., Cnwhl, Mumstore, liangjingjing_home, Liangjingjing_no1, iris927, B2b_baby, always888, Fashionfist (Fankai Group), XiaGuoCai Factory Store, Shantou Nanshen Crafts Industry Co., Ltd., Makeup2028, Houwa, Pawprint Store, Qcdf, Starshop_toy, Love11love, Sensentoy, Liuxi19880510, Wingsu, Loyuday Store, Songda CZ Store, Hyingstore, Top_toy, card_game, jiangsuzhonghengchongwuyongpinyouxiangongsi, shseller, Lovebaby_cn, Top_starhao and cocoa_baby
Case Number: 1:2019cv02616
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Preliminary Injunction Order granting, as set forth in the Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 8/2/19. (ddm)
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Fashionfist and Fortnite2018 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit text (ddm).
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER Preliminary Injunction re: #20 Motion Hearing,. (Seigel, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jean-Paul Boulee: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2019. Court heard argument from Plaintiffs' counsel regarding the motion to extend the ex parte temporary restraining order and motion for preliminary injunction. See transcript for details. Plaintiffs to submit a proposed order. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(ddm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 Mail sent to Mark Lawrence Seigel re #12 Order Returned as Undeliverable. UTF. (rjs)
July 29, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Songda CZ Store, kids_dress, liangjingjing_no1, liangjingjing_kitche, liangjingjing_watch, liangjingjing_home, b2b_life, top_starhao, b2b_baby, top_toy, liangjingjing_no3 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (ddm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to defendant LOVEHOME666, WATER2018, MAKEUP2028, QCDF, and LIUXI19880510 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants LOVEHOME666, WATER2018, MAKEUP2028, QCDF, and LIUXI19880510 filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff CCA AND B, LLC'S Motion to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order and Order to Show Cause #13 for an additional fourteen days, to July 30, 2019. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled and set before the Court for July 30, 2019, at 2:00 P.M., at which time Defendants and/or any other affected persons may challenge the appropriateness of the TRO and move to dissolve the same and shall appear and show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/15/19. (ddm)
July 15, 2019 TRO Bond Paid: $ 500.00, receipt number GAN100114129. (ddm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Temporary Restraining Order Bond, in an amount not to exceed $25,000, issued by Westfield Insurance Co., posted by CCA and B, LLC filed per #11 . (ddm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #14 Order to Show Cause, filed by CCA and B, LLC. (Cooper, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that Plaintiff show cause by July 15, 2019, why the Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order and Order to Show Cause should not expire on or before July 16, 2019, due to Plaintiff's failure to remit bond as ordered on July 2, 2019. The Court will not rule on Plaintiffs Motion to Extend until Plaintiff complies with this Order. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/12/19. (ddm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time for TRO and to Conduct Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #11 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause with Brief In Support by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Extend TRO, #2 Affidavit of Mark L. Seigel, Esq. in Support of Motion to Extend TRO, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seigel, Mark)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2306 before Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (jdb)
July 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Plaintiff's counsel re #12 Order. (ddm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/3/19. (ddm) (ddm).
July 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Plaintiff's counsel re #11 Order. (ddm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/2/19. (ddm) (ddm).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/1/19. (ddm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing exhibits to Proposed TRO by CCA and B, LLC re #4 Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Proposed TRO, #2 Exhibit B to Proposed TRO)(Seigel, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process by Electronic Means, #7 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, to District Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (ddm)
June 18, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause and #1 Complaint to District Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (rjs)
June 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Steve C. Jones no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-02616-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rjs)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE re #2 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff's counsel has advised the chambers of the Honorable Steve C. Jones that Plaintiff does not request a hearing on this motion and prefers that the Court rule on the filings. (pdw)
June 14, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rjs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 always888, #2 B2b baby, #3 B2b life, #4 BABEENI, #5 Baby mart8, #6 card game, #7 China zy, #8 Cnwhl, #9 cocoa baby, #10 Dongguan Jisen, #11 Dongguan Qianquian, #12 Elfdoll, #13 Fashionfist, #14 fortnight, #15 globalhouse, #16 houwa, #17 hyingstore, #18 iris, #19 jiansuz, #20 jinzhai, #21 kids dress, #22 liangjingjing home, #23 liangjingjing kitchen, #24 liangjingjing 1, #25 liangjingjing 3, #26 liangjingjing watch, #27 liuxi, #28 love11love, #29 lovebaby, #30 lovehome, #31 loyuday, #32 qcdf, #33 luckypets, #34 pawprint, #35 OuMeiDa, #36 makeup, #37 sunny, #38 wingsu, #39 yiwu lollipop, #40 starshop, #41 toy starhao, #42 top toy, #43 water, #44 songda cz, #45 shseller, #46 shenzhen, #47 sensetoy, #48 shantou nanshen, #49 xiaguocai, #50 mumstore)(jkl)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Notice of Filing, #6 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seigel, Mark)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Authorization to Serve by Alternative Means by CCA and B, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Authorization to Serve by Alternative Means, #2 Affidavit of Amanda McCarthy, #3 Affidavit of Jeffrey Sladkus, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Seigel, Mark) Modified on 7/2/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process by Electronic Means by CCA and B, LLC. (Seigel, Mark)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by CCA and B, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 to Sladkus Dec, #2 Exhibit A-2 to Sladkus Dec, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seigel, Mark) Modified on 7/2/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by CCA and B, LLC re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining OrderMOTION for Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for TRO, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause, #2 Affidavit of Michael Champion, #3 Affidavit of Amanda McCarthy, #4 Affidavit of Jeffrey Sladkus)(Seigel, Mark) Modified on 7/2/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
June 7, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause and #1 Complaint to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, Order to Show Cause by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(rjs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8714028) filed by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCA and B, LLC v. Air11 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinzhai County Blossom Import & Export Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lovehome666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elfdoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortnite2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Lollipop-Professional Garment Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny_baby1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liangjingjing_kitche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby_mart8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABEENI VIETNAM COMPANY LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2b_life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OuMeiDa Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luckypets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liangjingjing_watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Qianqian Apparel Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Busi-Booming Arts&Gifts Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids_dress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liangjingjing_no3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China_zy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Jisen Fashion Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cnwhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mumstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liangjingjing_home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liangjingjing_no1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iris927
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2b_baby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: always888
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashionfist (Fankai Group)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XiaGuoCai Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantou Nanshen Crafts Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makeup2028
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawprint Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qcdf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starshop_toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love11love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensentoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liuxi19880510
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyuday Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songda CZ Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyingstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top_toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: card_game
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiangsuzhonghengchongwuyongpinyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovebaby_cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top_starhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cocoa_baby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCA and B, LLC
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Represented By: Jason Harris Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Sladkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?