Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Skyline Pools, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: Skyline Pools, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02622
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Skyline Pools, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (sap)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED INCORRECTLY; SEE #5 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, as to Joseph Michael Artymowicz. (Bessho, David) Modified on 7/17/2019 (sap).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Skyline Pools, Inc. (bdb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons And Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (bdb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8714272) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Skyline Pools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Pools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Bessho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?