Smith v. Goldberg

Plaintiff: Cassandra M. Smith
Defendant: Ralph Goldberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv02651
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Submission of #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #46 Statement, #47 Response to Motion, and #48 Reply Brief to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (usw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ralph Goldberg. (Goldberg, Ralph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cassandra M. Smith. (tcc)
June 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra M. Smith re Notice (Other). (rsh)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE to Pro Se Party re: Dft filing of #45 Motion for Summary Judgment. (rsh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 46 STATEMENT re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ralph Goldberg. (Goldberg, Ralph)
June 24, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Ralph Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and 14)(Goldberg, Ralph) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
June 21, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph S. Goldberg on behalf of Ralph Goldberg (Goldberg, Ralph)
June 21, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ralph Goldberg. Discovery ends on 11/18/2019.(Goldberg, Ralph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ralph Goldberg, Cassandra M. Smith re #42 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (rsh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/20/19. (rsh)
June 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ralph Goldberg, Cassandra M. Smith re #41 Pro Se Case Instructions (rsh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 41 Instructions to Pro Se Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/20/19. (rsh)
June 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra M. Smith re #40 Order of Recusal. (dob)
June 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ralph Goldberg re #40 Order of Recusal. (dob)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-2651-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 6/19/2019. (dob)
June 11, 2019 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 3:18-cv-03011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 11, 2019 Filing 38 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #37 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith 2 Rosemount Court Blythewood, SC 29016 and Ralph Goldberg 1400 Montreal Rd., Ste. 100 Tucker, GA 30084 from Columbia. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION accepting #27 Report and Recommendation, the court TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/11/2019. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE from Cassandra Smith of communication received from Ralph Goldberg via US Mail (Attachments: #1 letter dated May 1, 2019 from Ralph Goldberg)(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Cassandra M. Smith to #27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 31 OBJECTION to #27 Report and Recommendation by Ralph Goldberg. Reply to Objections due by 4/10/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 28 Transfer of Case Management, #27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith and Ralph Goldberg (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 28 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge J. Michelle Childs. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina 29201. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, recommending that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/20/2019. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Ralph Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #23 Response in Opposition to Motion placed in U.S. Mail to Ralph Goldberg (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Cassandra M. Smith. Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith and Ralph Goldberg (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER (Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/22/2019, Discovery due by 4/19/2019, Motions due by 5/20/2019, Mediation Due by 6/18/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/21/2018. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #19 Roseboro Order placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/21/2018. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ralph Goldberg. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassandra M. Smith. Ralph Goldberg served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ralph Goldberg. Service due by 3/5/2019 (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith - Note: U.S. Mail did not run on 12/5/2018 due to National Day of Mourning. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/5/2018. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order and Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail to Cassandra M. Smith (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/20/2018. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cassandra M. Smith. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Cassandra M. Smith. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ralph Goldberg, filed by Cassandra M. Smith. (bgoo) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Goldberg
Represented By: Ralph S. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?