Salzhauer v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Plaintiff: Eliana Salzhauer
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company and Fairlife, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02709
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #14 Certificate of Interested Persons, and #11 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy E. Keller; and GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Levitt by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on July 17, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fairlife, LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Coca-Cola Company for Fairlife, LLC. (Coleman, Ronald)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendants. SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/17/19. (bnw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fairlife, LLC, The Coca-Cola Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Coca-Cola Company. (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Cashdan on behalf of The Coca-Cola Company (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr on behalf of Fairlife, LLC (Coleman, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam J. Levitt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8766032). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Adam J. Levitt added appearing on behalf of Eliana Salzhauer (pmb)
July 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Amy E. Keller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8766006). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Amy E. Keller added appearing on behalf of Eliana Salzhauer (pmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam J. Levitt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8766032). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Eliana Salzhauer. (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Amy E. Keller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8766006). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Eliana Salzhauer. (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fairlife, LLC, The Coca-Cola Company. (bnw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Coca-Cola Company. (bnw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Transfer filed in MDL by Eliana Salzhauer. (bnw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Eliana Salzhauer (Levitt, Adam)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/19/19. (bnw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eliana Salzhauer. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number agandc-8728435) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salzhauer v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairlife, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana Salzhauer
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Daniel Warshaw
Represented By: Adam M. Prom
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Sue J. Nam
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?