SynchView Technologies, LLC v. Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC et al

Plaintiff: SynchView Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc. and Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02727
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants TECHNICOLOR CONNECTED HOME USA LLC (TCH USA), and TECHNICOLOR USA, INC. (TUSA), must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended through and including August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 8/5/19. (rlb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Technicolor SA waiver mailed on 6/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendants TECHNICOLOR CONNECTED HOME USA LLC (TCH USA), and TECHNICOLOR USA, INC. (TUSA), must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended through and including August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 7/2/19. (rlb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendants Technicolor Connected Home USA, LLC, and Technicolor USA, Inc., filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Technicolor USA, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Technicolor SA. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Technicolor USA, Inc.. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC. (eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SynchView Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate: Intelleq Holdings, LLC for SynchView Technologies, LLC.(eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8730652) (Attachments: #1 Ex -A - US Patent 6,788,882, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SynchView Technologies, LLC v. Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SynchView Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor Connected Home USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?