SynchView Technologies, LLC v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: SynchView Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Holdings Corporation, Comcast Corporation, Comcast of CT/GA/MA/NH/NY/NC/VA/VT. LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC and Comcast Business Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02728
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/5/2020.(Miller, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 9, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Comcast Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Holdings Corporation, Comcast Business Communications, LLC and Comcase of CT/GA/MA/NH/NY/NC/VA/VT, LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (rlb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Defendants Other Than Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC (Kent, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer. The deadline by which all Defendants must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 7/5/2019. (bnp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, for all Defendants, filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Comcast Holdings Corporation served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Comcast of CT/GA/MA/NH/NY/NC/VA/VT. LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. Comcast Business Communications, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast of CT/GA/MA/NH/NY/NC/VA/VT. LLC. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast Business Communications, LLC. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast Holdings Corporation. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comcast Corporation. (eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SynchView Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate: Intelleq Holdings, LLC for SynchView Technologies, LLC. (eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by SynchView Technologies, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8730728) (Attachments: #1 Ex -A - US Patent 6,788,882, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SynchView Technologies, LLC v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of CT/GA/MA/NH/NY/NC/VA/VT. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Kastenberg
Represented By: Richard William Miller
Represented By: Chittam Udayan Thakore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Business Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SynchView Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?