Anderson v. Smith
Plaintiff: Sonya Anderson
Defendant: Anthony Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv02778
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rlb)
June 21, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (rlb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sonya Anderson (Goldberg, Ralph)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/19/19. (jkl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Statement Under Penalty of Perjury of Valerie Crumbsy re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sonya Anderson. (Goldberg, Ralph)
June 19, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge William M Ray II. (rlb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against All Defendants filed by Sonya Anderson.(Goldberg, Ralph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit text (rlb).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony Smith. (rlb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sonya Anderson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8737726) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Anderson
Represented By: Ralph S. Goldberg
Represented By: Laurene C. Cuvillier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?