J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Speakeasy Lounge LLC et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Clyde Ward and Speakeasy Lounge LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02871
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Speakeasy Lounge LLC, Clyde Ward. Discovery ends on 1/10/2020.(Abayomi-Rogers, Abena) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Speakeasy Lounge LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Clyde Ward served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (bnp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Clyde Ward and Speakeasy Lounge LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ward)(bnp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8748629) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Speakeasy Lounge LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Ward
Represented By: Abena K. Abayomi-Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speakeasy Lounge LLC
Represented By: Abena K. Abayomi-Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?