The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust v. Yardarm Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust
Defendant: Yardarm Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02875
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Clerk's Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Yardarm Technologies, Inc.. (Yungwirth, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Yardarm Technologies, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/15/2020.(Yungwirth, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Yardarm Technologies, Inc. Answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (sap)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Yardarm Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Gibson on behalf of Yardarm Technologies, Inc. (Gibson, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of Yardarm Technologies, Inc. (Yungwirth, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust. Yardarm Technologies, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (North, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bnp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Yardarm Technologies, Inc. (bnp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8748716) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8,947,252, #2 Exhibit B - Infringement Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust v. Yardarm Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nakkovoxx Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Calvert
Represented By: John L. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yardarm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Sean Yungwirth
Represented By: John R. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?