J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Tien Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Dung N. Ho, Tien Entertainment, LLC and Hiep Nguyen
Case Number: 1:2019cv02886
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Hiep Nguyen served on 8/4/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Tien Entertainment, LLC d/b/a MTV Lounge and Dung N. Ho. (jpa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Tien Entertainment, LLC and Dung N. Ho filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Dung N. Ho served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hiep Nguyen. (jpa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. for Hiep Nguyen (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc..(Reemsnyder, Ronald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Tien Entertainment, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 26, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (bnp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dung N. Ho and Tien Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ho)(bnp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8752045) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Tien Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dung N. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tien Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiep Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?