J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Esperanza Delia Lopez
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Esperanza Delia Lopez
Case Number: 1:2019cv02895
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/22/2019. (adg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Esperanza Delia Lopez. Discovery ends on 12/20/2019.(Hand, Kerry) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Esperanza Delia Lopez served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Esperanza Delia Lopez. (bnw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (bnw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8753197) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Esperanza Delia Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esperanza Delia Lopez
Represented By: Kerry Eston Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?