Patel v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bharat B. Patel
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02900
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bharat B. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tmf) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct filing date(tmf).
August 13, 2019 Submission of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC. (Wright, Kimberly)
August 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel re #19 Order. (tmf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time and leave to file excess pages re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Plaintiff seeks to file a single Response to the two Motions, and he further seeks to add up to five (5) additional pages for combining the Response to two (2) separate Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Motion to Dismiss by and including August 20, 2019, and can file no more than thirty-five (35) pages in the Response. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/5/2019. (tmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bharat B. Patel. (tmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to defendants re: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bharat B. Patel. (tmf) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit document links(tmf).
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Mendel, Jarrod)
July 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel re #15 Order on Motion to Stay. (tmf)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines as unopposed. The Court STAYS the discovery period and the parties' obligations to comply with the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) conference, serving initial disclosures, and filing a joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Should the Court later deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, the parties may commence discovery and shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan within thirty (30) days of the Court's Order denying such motion. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/24/2019. (tmf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation re #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines of Joinder (Kearns, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Security Deed, #3 Exhibit B -- Assignment, #4 Exhibit C -- Deed Under Power, #5 Exhibit D -- Complaint (First Action), #6 Exhibit E -- Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (First Action), #7 Exhibit F -- Response (First Action), #8 Exhibit G -- Reply (First Action), #9 Exhibit H -- Final Order (First Action), #10 Exhibit I -- Notice of Appeal (First Action), #11 Exhibit J -- Court of Appeals Opinion, #12 Exhibit K -- Supreme Court Docket (First Action))(Kearns, John)
July 23, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
July 9, 2019 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel re Minute Order on Motion for Extension of Time entered on July 9, 2019. (rvb)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant McCalla Raymer Leibert Peirce [sic], LLC's Motion to Dismiss #12 . Plaintiff shall have through and including July 30, 2019 to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In the future, Plaintiff should comply with this Court's Standing Order #2 and indicate whether opposing counsel consents to the extension within his motion (See dkt. #2 , pages 8-9). Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/09/2019. (rvb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC's #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bharat B. Patel. (tmf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bharat B. Patel. (tmf)
July 8, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Wright, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC. (Wright, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel re #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mailed to Bharat B. Patel 821 Rock Lane McDonough, GA 30253. (tmf)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Bank of America, N.A. Answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/1/2019. (tmf)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendel, Jarrod)
July 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel re #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mailed to Bharat B. Patel 821 Rock Lane McDonough, GA 30253 (tmf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC Answer due 7/24/2019; Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. Answer due 7/24/2019; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation Answer due 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/1/2019. (tmf)
July 1, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM (rvb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation identifying Corporate Parent American Capital Mortgage Investment Corporation for Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Bayview Asset Management for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Kearns, John)
June 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bharat B. Patel RE: #2 Order. (aaq)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 06/27/19.(aaq)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8753511) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- State Court File, #2 Exhibit B -- Consents to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Alan Wagner
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bharat B. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?