Jinks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Sisorlan Jinks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv02937
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Sisorlan Jinks. Attorney General served on 7/24/19.(Kennedy, Stephen) Modified on 8/2/2019 to edit text and correct party served (jta).
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Sisorlan Jinks. US Attorney served on 7/22/19. (Kennedy, Stephen) Modified on 8/2/2019 to edit text(jta).
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Sisorlan Jinks. Regional Counsel/SSA served on 7/22/19. (Kennedy, Stephen) Modified on 8/2/2019 to edit text and remove double wording (jta).
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Sisorlan Jinks. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/22/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Kennedy, Stephen) Modified on 8/1/2019 to edit answer due date. (jtj)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney. (dob)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to US Attorney General. (dob)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Counsel. (dob)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to The General Counsel. (dob)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sisorlan Jinks William Barr, Attorney General of the United States (Kennedy, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sisorlan Jinks Byung Pak US Attorney Northern District of GA (Kennedy, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sisorlan Jinks Office of Regional Counsel IV (Kennedy, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sisorlan Jinks General Counsel Summons (Kennedy, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re Clerks Certificate of Mailing: Filed in error. (sap)
July 1, 2019 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: #4 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-02937-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (sap)
July 1, 2019 (FILED IN ERROR) Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sisorlan Jinks re #2 Order. (sap) Modified on 7/1/2019 (sap).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sisorlan Jinks. (sap)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Sisorlan Jinks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall go forward as any other civil case and Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Counsel for Plaintiff is therefore appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant under Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 7/1/2019. (sap)
June 28, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Sisorlan Jinks. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Consent to Proceed)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jinks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisorlan Jinks
Represented By: Stephen T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?