Eubanks v. Boggs et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Eubanks
Defendant: Officer Keith Nichols, Officer Robert Howell, Officer Adam Hicks, Officer Philip Dillard, Officer Gerald Pitts, Officer Eric Hayes, Officer William Cooley, Officer Tim Robertson, Officer Justin Boggs and Officer Shannon Brady
Case Number: 1:2019cv02944
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/22/2019. (rjs)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For All Defendants to File Their First Responsive Pleading by Justin Boggs, Philip Dillard, Robert Howell, Keith Nichols, Gerald Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Gary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Kicklighter on behalf of Shannon Brady, William Cooley, Eric Hayes, Adam Hicks, Tim Robertson (Kicklighter, Kelsey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alan Britt on behalf of Shannon Brady, William Cooley, Eric Hayes, Adam Hicks, Tim Robertson (Britt, Russell)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alan Britt on behalf of Shannon Brady, William Cooley, Eric Hayes, Adam Hicks, Tim Robertson (Britt, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline Eubanks. Shannon Brady waiver mailed on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; William Cooley waiver mailed on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; Eric Hayes waiver mailed on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; Adam Hicks waiver mailed on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; Tim Robertson waiver mailed on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Hicks Waiver, #2 Hayes Waiver, #3 Brady Waiver, #4 Robertson Waiver, #5 Cooley Waiver)(Starks, Vera)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jacqueline Eubanks re: pre trial instructions appendix (Starks, Vera)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jacqueline Eubanks (Starks, Vera)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jacqueline Eubanks. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8758235) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eubanks v. Boggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Eubanks
Represented By: Vera LaWanda Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Keith Nichols
Represented By: Gary Kevin Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Robert Howell
Represented By: Gary Kevin Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Adam Hicks
Represented By: Russell Alan Britt
Represented By: Kelsey Kicklighter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Philip Dillard
Represented By: Gary Kevin Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gerald Pitts
Represented By: Gary Kevin Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Hayes
Represented By: Russell Alan Britt
Represented By: Kelsey Kicklighter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer William Cooley
Represented By: Russell Alan Britt
Represented By: Kelsey Kicklighter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tim Robertson
Represented By: Russell Alan Britt
Represented By: Kelsey Kicklighter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Justin Boggs
Represented By: Gary Kevin Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shannon Brady
Represented By: Russell Alan Britt
Represented By: Kelsey Kicklighter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?