SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective et al v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Eva Lathrop, Lisa Haddad, Carrie Cwiak, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., FemHealth USA and FemHealth USA doing business as Carafem
Defendant: Andrew Reisman, LaSharn Hughes, Thomas Hardin, Jr., David W. Retterbush, Richard L. Weil, Rob Law, Meg Heap, John Melvin, Kathleen Toomey, Sherry Boston, E. Daniel DeLoach, Danny Porter, Brian Kemp, Michael Fowler, Sr., John S. Antalis, Gretchen Collins, Christopher M. Carr, Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, Charmaine Faucher, Barby J. Simmons, Alexander S. Gross, Matthew W. Norman, Paul L. Howard, Jr., Debi Dalton and Joyette M. Holmes
Case Number: 1:2019cv02973
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 159 USCA Order GRANTING Emily B. Nestler's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Appellees Feminist Women's Health Center and Columbus Women's Health Organization re: #153 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Hardin, Jr., Matthew W. Norman, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John S. Antalis, Debi Dalton, Richard L. Weil, Barby J. Simmons, Meg Heap, Danny Porter, Kathleen Toomey, David W. Retterbush, Charmaine Faucher, E. Daniel DeLoach, Andrew Reisman, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Michael Fowler, Sr., Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, LaSharn Hughes, Alexander S. Gross. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-13024-GG. (kac) Modified on 11/8/2021 (kac). (kac).
September 27, 2021 Filing 158 USCA Order GRANTING Stay pending a decision of the Supreme Court of the United States in Dobbs v. Jackson Womens Health Organization, No. 19-1392 (2021) re: #153 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Hardin, Jr., Matthew W. Norman, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John S. Antalis, Debi Dalton, Richard L. Weil, Barby J. Simmons, Meg Heap, Danny Porter, Kathleen Toomey, David W. Retterbush, Charmaine Faucher, E. Daniel DeLoach, Andrew Reisman, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Michael Fowler, Sr., Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, LaSharn Hughes, Alexander S. Gross. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-13024-GG. (kac)
September 7, 2021 Filing 157 USCA Order: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Elizabeth Karen Watson is GRANTED re: #153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas Hardin, Jr., Matthew W. Norman, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John S. Antalis, Debi Dalton, Richard L. Weil, Barby J. Simmons, Meg Heap, Danny Porter, Kathleen Toomey, David W. Retterbush, Charmaine Faucher, E. Daniel DeLoach, Andrew Reisman, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Michael Fowler, Sr., Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, LaSharn Hughes and Alexander S. Gross. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-13024-V. (pjm)
September 18, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #153 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-13024-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac)
August 14, 2020 Filing 156 USCA Acknowledgment of #153 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Hardin, Jr., Matthew W. Norman, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John S. Antalis, Debi Dalton, Richard L. Weil, Barby J. Simmons, Meg Heap, Danny Porter, Kathleen Toomey, David W. Retterbush, Charmaine Faucher, E. Daniel DeLoach, Andrew Reisman, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Michael Fowler, Sr., Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, LaSharn Hughes, Alexander S. Gross. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-13024-G. (kac)
August 11, 2020 Filing 155 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #153 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
August 11, 2020 Filing 154 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #153 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Hardin, Jr., Matthew W. Norman, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John S. Antalis, Debi Dalton, Richard L. Weil, Barby J. Simmons, Meg Heap, Danny Porter, Kathleen Toomey, David W. Retterbush, Charmaine Faucher, E. Daniel DeLoach, Andrew Reisman, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Michael Fowler, Sr., Julia Slater, Joe Sam Robinson, LaSharn Hughes, Alexander S. Gross. (kac)
August 11, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #149 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, #150 Clerk's Judgment by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-10016222. Transcript Order Form due on 8/25/2020 (Pinson, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until 60 days after either the conclusion of all substantive appeals and/or the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari on the merits of this case expires to file any motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/24/2020. (rjs)
July 22, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/23/2020 (rjs).
July 13, 2020 Filing 150 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to judgment as a matter of law on Counts I and II of their #1 Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Plaintiffs' #124 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The State Defendants' #125 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Court thus declares the rights of the parties as follows: Sections 3 and 4 of H.B. 481 violate the Fourteenth Amendment of the United States Constitution. The Court ORDERS that all Defendants, and all their respective officers, successors in office, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and persons acting in concert or participation with them, are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing H.B. 481 (Georgia General Assembly 2019-20 Legislative Session) in its entirety. As a result, the State of Georgia's abortion laws that were in effect prior to the passage of H.B. 481 remain in effect. As there are no further issues outstanding, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/13/2020. (rjs)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (adg) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
July 2, 2020 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT of the Video-Conference Hearing Proceedings held on June 15, 2020, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber David A. Ritchie. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 2, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. (Watson, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2020 Filing 143 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Oral argument heard on Parties' motions for summary judgment. Matter taken under advisement by the Court, with written ruling to follow in due course. #124 Motion for Summary Judgment TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT #125 Motion for Summary Judgment TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Application for Admission of Brigitte Amiri Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/9/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
June 9, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #141 APPLICATION for Admission of Brigitte Amiri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9765225).. Attorney Brigitte Amiri added appearing on behalf of SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective (cdg)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: Hearing on the parties' motions for summary judgment #124 and #125 . Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Steve C. Jones. The Court directs the parties to file any exhibits they intend to introduce during the hearing on the docket using CM/ECF's "Notice" function by noon on Friday, June 12, 2020. Any exhibits should be marked and numbered before filing. Participants must name/rename their Zoom profile to reflect their full name for purposes of identification. The hearing will be locked to new participants at 10:10 AM. Connection Instructions: Jun 15, 2020 10:00 AM Eastern Time (US and Canada) Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614442571 Meeting ID: 161 444 2571 Password: 047900 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1614442571#,,1#,047900# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1614442571#,,1#,047900# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Meeting ID: 161 444 2571 Password: 047900 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/aeGm9rI667 Join by SIP 1614442571@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 444 2571 Password: 047900 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 141 APPLICATION for Admission of Brigitte Amiri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9765225).by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. (Young, Sean) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Filing 139 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Sean Young replacing attorney Susan Talcott Camp. (Young, Sean)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (adg) (ADI)
April 13, 2020 Submission of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
April 9, 2020 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Response to additional SMF)(Harris, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 136 REPLY BRIEF re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Defendant Sherry Boston filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
April 9, 2020 Filing 135 REPLY BRIEF re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: In light of the guidance issued by public health authorities regarding the COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. #124 ) and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. #125 ) is RESET for Monday, June 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1907. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/9/2020. (rjs)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (aaq) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (rjs)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for all parties to file replies in support of summary judgment is extended until April 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/16/2020. (rjs)
March 13, 2020 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2020 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, Paul L. Howard, Jr, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Response to plaintiffs' SMF)(Harris, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2020 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sherry Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Sherry Boston, #2 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts)(Bauer, S.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defs.' Stmt of Undisputed Facts and Pls.' Stmt. of Add'l Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1)(Young, Sean)
March 12, 2020 Filing 126 RESPONSE re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul L. Howard, Jr. (Hall, Steven)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #124 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment and #125 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. Each side will be apportioned one hour for oral argument.(pdw)
February 20, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, Paul L. Howard, Jr, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Jeffrey) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
February 20, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Sean) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
February 16, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Marie Morrissey Victoria on behalf of Sherry Boston (Morrissey Victoria, Erin)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: The parties are reminded that any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before February 20, 2020. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within thirty days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/21/2020. (rjs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE State Defendants Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production by Christopher M. Carr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Danny Porter, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey.(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2020 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Paul L. Howard, Jr.(Hall, Steven)
January 17, 2020 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sherry Boston's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests Addressed to all Defendants by Sherry Boston.(Bauer, S.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pls.' First Set of RFA's, Interrogatories, and RFP's to All Defs. by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C..(Young, Sean)
December 13, 2019 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Defendants Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C..(Young, Sean)
December 6, 2019 Filing 116 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for want of prosecution re: #110 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-14726-DD. (kac)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #104 Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit Discovery. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/3/2019. (rjs)
December 2, 2019 Filing 114 USCA Acknowledgment of #110 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherry Boston. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-14726-DD. (kac)
December 2, 2019 Submission of #104 MOTION for Discovery to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY BRIEF re #104 MOTION for Discovery : to limit discovery and for expedited consideration filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Def. Curlin expert report, #2 Exhibit B - Def. Skop expert report)(Young, Sean)
November 26, 2019 Filing 112 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #110 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherry Boston. (kac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #1 Corrected USCA Transmission Letter) (kac).
November 26, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #110 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
November 26, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re: #112 USCA Appeal Transmission. (kac)
November 25, 2019 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil.(Harris, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #101 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Sherry Boston. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-9120576. Transcript Order Form due on 12/6/2019 (Bauer, S.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil.(Harris, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 108 RESPONSE re #104 MOTION for Discovery : to limit discovery and for expedited consideration filed by Paul L. Howard, Jr. (Hall, Steven)
November 12, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION for Discovery : to limit discovery and for expedited consideration filed by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, Joyette M. Holmes, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Harris, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Sherry Boston.(Byrnside, Ian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Plaintiffs' request for expedited consideration of their discovery motion at Doc. No. #104 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for a stay of the discovery period while the Court decides their motion at Doc. No. #104 is also DENIED. Response and reply briefs shall be due in accordance with the time limits provided by this Court's Local Rules. A substantive ruling on the motion will follow at the conclusion of the briefing period. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/5/2019. (rjs)
October 29, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for Discovery : to limit discovery and for expedited consideration by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
October 28, 2019 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sherry Boston's Initial Disclosures by Sherry Boston.(Byrnside, Ian)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting as unopposed #89 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca Ann Chan for Plaintiffs SisterSong, ACWC, A WMC, carafem, Summit, and Drs. Cwiak, Haddad and Lathrop. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/28/2019. (pdw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 102 Initial Disclosures by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C..(Young, Sean)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying #95 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In finding that Plaintiffs have sufficiently alleged an "actual controversy" between themselves and Defendant Boston, Defendant Boston's Motion to Dismiss for failure to state claim under the Declaratory Judgment Act is denied. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/24/2019. (jed)
October 24, 2019 Filing 100 REPLY BRIEF re #95 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sherry Boston. (Bauer, S.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing Proceedings held on September 23, 2019, before Judge Steve. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
October 10, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The Court determines that Plaintiffs have met their burden for the issuance of a preliminary injunction. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Doc. No. #24 . The Court ORDERS that Defendants, and all their respective officers, successors in office, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and persons acting in concert or participation with them, are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from enforcing H.B. 481 (Georgia General Assembly 201920 Legislative Session). This preliminary injunction remains in effect until further order from this Court. As a result, the State of Georgia's abortion laws that were in effect prior to the passage of H.B. 481 remain in effect. Consistent with the foregoing reasons and in the absence of a request from Defendants, the Court, in the exercise of its discretion, waives the bond requirement set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/1/2019. (rjs)
September 30, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Paul L. Howard, Jr.(Hall, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 30, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Sherry Boston. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Bauer, S.) Modified on 10/1/2019 (rjs).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #90 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties are assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery ends on January 18, 2020. Pursuant to Local Rules 7.2 and 16.4, any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within thirty days of the close of discovery. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within thirty days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/27/2019. (rjs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 93 Initial Disclosures by Paul L. Howard, Jr.(Hall, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a transcript of the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 held before the undersigned on September 23, 2019 be prepared for this Court's consideration. The cost of said transcript shall be divided equally between the first-named Plaintiff and first-named Defendant. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/23/2019. (rjs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 . The Court heard oral argument from counsel and took the matter under advisement, with ruling to follow in due course. #24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(rjs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 90 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
September 18, 2019 Submission of #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Withdrawal (construed by the Clerk as a) MOTION to Withdraw Rebecca Ann Chan as Attorney. (rjs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 88 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Response to Defendant Boston's Opposition filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
September 13, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Response to Defendants' (other than Howard and Boston) Opposition filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #64 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Steven Christopher Begakis. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/5/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 85 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Steven Christopher Begakis re #86 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 84 Mail sent to Patrick Strawbridge re #66 Order on Application for Admission PHV Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (rjs)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion. Defendant Joyette M. Holmes is substituted for Defendant John Melvin as a party to this action. Defendant Holmes will be joined as a signatory to Defendants' Answer, ECF No. 73, and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 74. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/28/2019. (rjs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION to Join Answer and Response to Preliminary Injunction by Joyette Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Motion to Join Answer and Response to Preliminary Injunction)(Pinson, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE by Joyette Holmes of Automatic Substitution of a Party (Pinson, Andrew)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be extended to September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/22/2019. (rjs)
August 22, 2019 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Supp. of Pls.' Mot. for Prelim. Inj. re: #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Tandy Menk on behalf of Sherry Boston (Menk, Jacqueline)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Howard to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to and including September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/20/2019. (rjs)
August 19, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Dally Whitley on behalf of Paul L. Howard, Jr (Whitley, Joe)
August 19, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Paul L. Howard, Jr. (Klein, Linda)
August 19, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. Discovery ends on 1/16/2020.(Pinson, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #64 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Christopher Begakis Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Steven Christopher Begakis added appearing on behalf of Christopher M. Carr, Brian Kemp (pmb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kyle Byrnside on behalf of Sherry Boston (Byrnside, Ian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sherry Boston. (Bauer, S.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Margaret Carrier on behalf of Paul L. Howard, Jr (Carrier, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Hall on behalf of Paul L. Howard, Jr (Hall, Steven)
August 15, 2019 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Paul L. Howard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Linda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Ann Klein on behalf of Paul L. Howard, Jr (Klein, Linda)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #62 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Patrick Strawbridge. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/15/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #61 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Jeffrey Matthew Harris. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/15/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
August 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jeffrey Matthew Harris re #65 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Patrick Strawbridge re #66 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 64 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Christopher Begakis Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 RETURN of #63 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Christopher Begakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848626). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts and number. (pmb)
August 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #61 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Matthew Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848548). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Harris added appearing on behalf of Christopher M. Carr, Brian Kemp (pmb)
August 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick Strawbridge Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848604). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Patrick Strawbridge added appearing on behalf of Christopher M. Carr, Brian Kemp (pmb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 63 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Christopher Begakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848626). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 62 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick Strawbridge Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848604). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 61 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Matthew Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8848548). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, Meg Heap, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Sherry Boston to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to and including September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/6/2019. (rjs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by Sherry Boston re #52 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, S.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #25 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, #1 Complaint,, #46 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. re: Julia Slater and Meg Heap (Young, Sean)
August 2, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #25 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. re: Defendants Melvin, Porter, Heap, Slater, Boston (Young, Sean)
August 2, 2019 Filing 56 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Julia Slater served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Young, Sean)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Karin Watson. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/2/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Susan Talcott Camp. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/2/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Ann Chan. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/2/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Sherry Boston to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to and including September 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/2/2019. (rjs)
August 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Elizabeth Karin Watson re #55 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Susan Talcott Camp re #54 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Rebecca Ann Chan re #53 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sherry Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Answer Complaint)(Bauer, S.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 50 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Sherry Boston. Sherry Boston served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Bauer, S.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 49 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Meg Heap served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Young, Sean)
August 1, 2019 Filing 48 Return of Service Unexecuted by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. as to E. Daniel DeLoach. (Young, Sean)
August 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #43 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Karin Watson Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803923). Attorney Sean Young added appearing on behalf of SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective (jkm)
August 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #44 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Talcott Camp Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803948). Attorney Sean Young added appearing on behalf of Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, et al. (jkm)
August 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #45 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Ann Chan Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803939).. Attorney Sean Young added appearing on behalf of SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective et al. (jkm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Electronic Summons Issued,,, #25 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, #1 Complaint,, #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. re: Defendants Kemp, Carr, Toomey, and the Members and Executive Director of the Georgia Composite Medical Board (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for all Defendants to file Answers or Oppositions to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be extended to August 19, 2019. Plaintiffs' deadline to reply to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 24] is similarly extended to September 6, 2019. In light of this change, the HEARING on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is RESET for MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 23, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1907. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/30/2019. (rjs)
July 30, 2019 Filing 45 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Ann Chan Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Talcott Camp Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 43 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Karin Watson Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time file Answer and opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order file Answer and opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Pinson, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Persons by John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Pinson, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Alan Pinson on behalf of John S. Antalis, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr, Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr, LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, Matthew W. Norman, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil (Pinson, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 Return of Service Unexecuted by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. as to Barby J. Simmons. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 Return of Service Unexecuted by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. as to Thomas Hardin, Jr. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 Return of Service Unexecuted by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. as to Debi Dalton. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Richard L. Weil served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 35 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. LaSharn Hughes served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Rob Law served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Charmaine Faucher served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Andrew Reisman served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Alexander S. Gross served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Gretchen Collins served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Danny Porter served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. John Melvin served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Paul L. Howard, Jr served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Kathleen Toomey served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: All Defendants to file Answers August 19, 2019. (rjs)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Defendants who wish to file a response brief shall do so by Monday, August 12, 2019. Plaintiffs' reply brief is due by Thursday, August 29, 2019. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Wednesday, September 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1907. As no entry of appearance has yet been made by or on behalf of Defendants, counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to serve Defendant with notice of this proceeding. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/24/2019. (rjs)
July 24, 2019 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Karin Watson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803923). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
July 24, 2019 RETURN of #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Ann Chan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803939). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
July 24, 2019 RETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Talcott Camp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803948). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Pls.' Mot. for Prelin. Inj., #2 Declaration of Sean J. Young, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Christopher M. Carr served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. Brian Kemp served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Young, Sean)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Talcott Camp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803948). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Ann Chan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803939). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Karin Watson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803923). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C.. (Young, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Susan Lambiase. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/15/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Carrie Y. Flaxman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/15/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Carrie Y. Flaxman re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Susan Lambiase re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
July 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie Y. Flaxman Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Sean Young added appearing on behalf of Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic (jkm)
July 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Sean Young added appearing on behalf of Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. (jkm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joyette Holmes. (rjs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Emily Nestler. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/9/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kirby Tyrrell. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/9/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Julie Rikelman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/9/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Young, Sean)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie Y. Flaxman Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Young, Sean)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Kirby Tyrrell re #14 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Julie Rikelman re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. Joyette Holmes, new Cobb County District Attorney (Young, Sean)
July 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Rikelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763509). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Julie Rikelman added appearing on behalf of Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center (pmb)
July 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kirby Tyrrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763565). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kirby Tyrrell added appearing on behalf of Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center (pmb)
July 5, 2019 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: duplicate. (pmb)
July 5, 2019 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763638). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: petitioner's address. (pmb)
July 5, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Nestler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763599). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Emily B. Nestler added appearing on behalf of Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center (pmb)
July 5, 2019 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie Y. Flaxman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763574). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: petitioner's address. (pmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Lambiase Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763638). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie Y. Flaxman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763574). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Nestler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763599). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kirby Tyrrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763565). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Rikelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8763509). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Feminist Women's Health Center. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to John S. Antalis, Sherry Boston, Christopher M. Carr, Gretchen Collins, Debi Dalton, E. Daniel DeLoach, Charmaine Faucher, Michael Fowler, Sr., Alexander S. Gross, Thomas Hardin, Jr., Meg Heap, Paul L. Howard, Jr., LaSharn Hughes, Brian Kemp, Rob Law, John Melvin, Matthew W. Norman, Danny Porter, Andrew Reisman, David W. Retterbush, Joe Sam Robinson, Barby J. Simmons, Julia Slater, Kathleen Toomey, Richard L. Weil. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(rjs)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Carrie Cwiak, FemHealth USA, Feminist Women's Health Center, Lisa Haddad, Eva Lathrop, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Summit Medical Associates, P.C. identifying Corporate Parent Ninepatch for Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic; Corporate Parent Humedco Corp. for Atlanta Women's Medical Center. (Young, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8761556) filed by Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Carrie Cwiak, Summit Medical Associates, P.C., Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C., Lisa Haddad, FemHealth USA, Eva Lathrop, Feminist Women's Health Center, Atlanta Women's Medical Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 28, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective et al v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Lathrop
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Haddad
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Cwiak
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feminist Women's Health Center
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Julie Rikelman
Represented By: Emily B. Nestler
Represented By: Kirby Tyrrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Comprehensive Wellness Clinic
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Women's Medical Center
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Medical Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Women's Health Organization, P.C.
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Julie Rikelman
Represented By: Emily B. Nestler
Represented By: Kirby Tyrrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FemHealth USA
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FemHealth USA doing business as Carafem
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Elizabeth Karin Watson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Reisman
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSharn Hughes
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hardin, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Retterbush
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Weil
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Law
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Heap
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Toomey
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Boston
Represented By: Ian Kyle Byrnside
Represented By: Jacqueline Tandy Menk
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Erin Marie Morrissey Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Daniel DeLoach
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Porter
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fowler, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Antalis
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Collins
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Carr
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Slater
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Sam Robinson
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmaine Faucher
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barby J. Simmons
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander S. Gross
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W. Norman
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Represented By: Joe Dally Whitley
Represented By: Linda Ann Klein
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debi Dalton
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyette M. Holmes
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?