Reese v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tynika Reese
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv02997
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-2997-JSA. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlb)
July 30, 2019 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Tynika Reese. (Burgess, Anjel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Chief of Counsel, #2 U.S. Attorney General)(rlb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Tynika Reese. (Attachments: #1 Contract, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 is GRANTED. Counsel for Plaintiff is appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/2/19. (rlb) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit file date (rlb).
July 2, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tynika Reese. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Contract, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynika Reese
Represented By: Anjel Floyd Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?