Hagler v. Williams
Plaintiff: Dereky Martin Hagler
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Williams and Tammy Rivera Malphurs
Case Number: 1:2019cv03015
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff by Tammy Rivera Williams.(Watkins, E.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Tammy Rivera Williams.(Watkins, E.)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned a six-month discovery period. Discovery shall close on February 24, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/27/19. (ddm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dereky Martin Hagler. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ross, Tremaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tammy Rivera Williams. (Watkins, E.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim by Dereky Martin Hagler.(Ross, Tremaine) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Submission of #6 MOTION to Add Party as Counter-Defendant, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Add Party as Counter-Defendant with Brief In Support by Tammy Rivera Williams. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Join Party)(Watkins, E.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 12/23/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Tammy Rivera Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract)(Watkins, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service in re OFFER OF JUDGMENT filed by Dereky Martin Hagler. (Ross, Tremaine) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit docket entry (ddm).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Cover sheet , as to Defendant Tammy Rivera Williams (Malphurs). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (AOS of Dekalb County Sheriff's Office))(Ross, Tremaine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tammy Rivera Williams. (bdb)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED) with Jury Demand filed by Dereky Martin Hagler. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8764533) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagler v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Williams
Represented By: Charles D. Graham
Represented By: E. Brian Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Malphurs
Represented By: Charles D. Graham
Represented By: E. Brian Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dereky Martin Hagler
Represented By: Tremaine Quindon Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?