McCullough v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Terri Lashawn McCullough
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv03082
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Janet F King
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/26/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
July 17, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8788301). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kathleen Marie Flynn added appearing on behalf of Terri Lashawn McCullough (jkm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8788301). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Terri Lashawn McCullough. (Flynn, Kathleen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(bnp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Terri Lashawn McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will provide service on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 7/9/19. (bnp)
July 9, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Terri Lashawn McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lashawn McCullough
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?