Singleton v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard J. Singleton
Defendant: Jonathan Henson, Cortez Mason, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Corporation and Steve Moose
Case Number: 1:2019cv03133
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Clerk's Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Golden, Peter)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Steve Moose.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Cortez Mason.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Jonathan Henson.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Discovery ends on 1/10/2020.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 (DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #9 ) Return of Service Executed by Richard J. Singleton. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lampros, Peter) Modified on 8/5/2019 (sap).
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Richard J. Singleton. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lampros, Peter) Defendant served corrected on 8/5/2019 (sap).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Richard J. Singleton. Jonathan Henson served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lampros, Peter)
July 29, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed. Steve Moose served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lampros, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit answer due date (rlb).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Richard J. Singleton. Steve Moose served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lampros, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit answer due date (rlb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Steve Moose. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jonathan Henson. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cortez Mason. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (eop)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation. (eop)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Richard J. Singleton. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8781891) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Singleton
Represented By: Peter Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Henson
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Mason
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Moose
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?