Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 1:2019cv03144
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall be granted an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint through and including November 11, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/28/19. (bnp)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 to edit event type (bnp).
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Samuel Williams replacing attorney Flora Manship. (Williams, Samuel)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/20/19. (bnw)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/9/19. (ddm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney's Office. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8783375) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Flora Manship
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?