Palmer v. The Binding Site, Inc.
Plaintiff: Will Levy Palmer, III
Defendant: The Binding Site, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03154
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: William M Ray
2 Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Will Levy Palmer, III. (Holliday, Andrew)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. The parties are hereby instructed to conduct their Local Rule 16.1 conference no later than Friday, August 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/22/19. (rlb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Local Rule 16.1 Conference by Will Levy Palmer, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holliday, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Will Levy Palmer, III. (Holliday, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Binding Site, Inc.. (Jain, Sapna)
August 16, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 08/16/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Binding Site, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/6/2020.(Jain, Sapna) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by The Binding Site, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Doug Anderson)(Jain, Sapna) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 8/12/2019 (rlb).
August 2, 2019 Clerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 6014308. (Holliday, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Will Levy Palmer, III. The Binding Site, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Holliday, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Binding Site, Inc.. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Will Levy Palmer, III. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8784946) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. The Binding Site, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Binding Site, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Mohl
Represented By: Sapna Kumari Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Levy Palmer, III
Represented By: Andrew Wayne Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?