Dent et al v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Cherie Morgan, Jeannie Babb and Bobbi Dent
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District 142, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Lodge 2339
Case Number: 1:2019cv03172
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherie Morgan, Bobbi Dent, Jeannie Babb. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO waiver mailed on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherie Morgan, Bobbi Dent, Jeannie Babb. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District 142 waiver mailed on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherie Morgan, Bobbi Dent, Jeannie Babb. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Lodge 2339 waiver mailed on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 5-8, 2019, December 5-14, 2019, by Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Compliance) by Charles Ronald Bridgers on behalf of Jeannie Babb, Bobbi Dent, Cherie Morgan (Bridgers, Charles)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jeannie Babb, Bobbi Dent, Cherie Morgan. (Bridgers, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/15/19. (bnp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Lodge 2339. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District 142. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO. (eop)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cherie Morgan, Bobbi Dent and Jeannie Babb. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8787918) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dent et al v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Morgan
Represented By: Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Ronald Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Babb
Represented By: Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Ronald Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Dent
Represented By: Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Ronald Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District 142
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Lodge 2339
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?