Vision Warriors Church, Inc. v. Cherokee County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Vision Warriors Church, Inc.
Defendant: Steve West, Ray Gunnin, Corey Ragsdale, Benny Carter, Cherokee County Board of Commissioners and Harry Johnston
Case Number: 1:2019cv03205
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re Order on Application for Admission PHV to Abigail A. Southerland, Francis J. Manion and Michelle Terry. (adg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail Southerland; granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Manion; and granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle K. Terry by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on September 3, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
September 3, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Francis J. Manion Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8895834). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Francis J. Manion added appearing on behalf of Vision Warriors Church, Inc. (pmb)
September 3, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle K. Terry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8896600). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Michelle Terry added appearing on behalf of Vision Warriors Church, Inc. (pmb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle K. Terry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8896600). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.. (Underwood, J.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Francis J. Manion Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8895834). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.. (Underwood, J.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. by Vision Warriors Church, Inc..(Underwood, J.) Modified on 9/4/2019 to correct docket text (adg).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 30 days from the filing of this Order for defendants to Answer or file Motions re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/22/2019. (adg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motions in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Benny Carter, Cherokee County Board of Commissioners, Ray Gunnin, Harry Johnston, Corey Ragsdale, Steve West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Defensive Pleadings or Motions in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Davis, Angela)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Steve West served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Ray Gunnin served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Harry Johnston served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Corey Ragsdale served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019.. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Cherokee County Board of Commissioners Chairman served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.Cherokee County Board of Commissioners served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. . (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used (adg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.. Benny Carter served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Underwood, J.) Modified on 8/21/2019, wrong event used.(adg).
July 29, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Southerland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8812819). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Abigail A. Southerland added appearing on behalf of Vision Warriors Church, Inc. (pmb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Southerland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8812819). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.. (Underwood, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Benny Carter, Cherokee County Board of Commissioners, Ray Gunnin, Harry Johnston, Corey Ragsdale, Steve West. (Attachments: #1 Summons CCBOC, #2 Summons Benny Carter, #3 Summons Ray Gunnin, #4 Summons Harry Johnston, #5 Summons Corey Ragsdale, #6 Summons Steve West)(bnw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Steve West (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Corey Ragsdale (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Harry Johnston (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Ray Gunnin (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Benny Carter (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Cherokee County BOC c/o Chairman (Underwood, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc. Cherokee County BOC c/o Angie Davis (Underwood, J.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/16/19. (bnw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Vision Warriors Church, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8793085) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Incomplete Proposed Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Warriors Church, Inc. v. Cherokee County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve West
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Gunnin
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Ragsdale
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Carter
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Johnston
Represented By: Angela E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Warriors Church, Inc.
Represented By: J. Ethan Underwood
Represented By: Francis J. Manion
Represented By: Abigail A. Southerland
Represented By: Michelle K. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?