Boone v. Saul,Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sheila D. Boone
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03207
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Sheila D. Boone. Andrew Saul served on 8/22/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Hogan, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(jta)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to ISSUE electronic summonses to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 08/16/2019. (cmb)
August 15, 2019 Submission of #2 Order, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (jta)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Sheila D. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sheila D. Boone re USM 285 Forms Sent. (jta)
July 22, 2019 Forms sent to party: USM 285 per #2 Order. (jta)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall therefore proceed as any other civil action. Under Rule 4(c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court must order the United States Marshal to serve process when the plaintiff is authorized to proceed IFP. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO FORWARD sufficient USM 285 Forms to Plaintiffs counsel. Because it appears that Plaintiffs counsel has already completed sufficient summonses, the Clerk need not forward blank summons forms to Plaintiffs counsel. On June 17, 2019, Andrew Saul was sworn in as the Commissioner of Social Security. Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Saul is automatically substituted as a party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d). The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to amend the case style to reflect the substitution. Upon receipt, Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the forms and return them to the Clerk within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, so that process may be served upon Defendant. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service service packages for Defendant. The service packages must include the USM 285 form, the summons, and one (1) copy of the complaint. Upon receipt of the service packages, the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant. The completed USM 285 forms shall be filed with the Clerk. If counsel for Plaintiff prefers, counsel may arrange for service of the complaint to Defendant without involving the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/22/19. (jta)
July 16, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Sheila D. Boone. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. Saul,Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila D. Boone
Represented By: John Vincent Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?