Wordlaw v. Prodew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mihsah Wordlaw
Defendant: Prodew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03217
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mihsah Wordlaw. (Roberts, Victor)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Prodew, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/27/2020.(Kertscher, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Prodew, Inc. Answer due 9/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/13/19. (klb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Order) (klb).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Responsive Pleading by Prodew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kertscher, Douglas) Modified on 8/13/2019 (sap).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Kertscher on behalf of Prodew, Inc. (Kertscher, Douglas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Mihsah Wordlaw. Prodew, Inc. served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Roberts, Victor)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Prodew, Inc.. (eop)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mihsah Wordlaw. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8795121) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wordlaw v. Prodew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodew, Inc.
Represented By: Blakely Holloway Frye
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mihsah Wordlaw
Represented By: Victor Severin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?