Stokes v. El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: K. Scott Stokes
Defendant: El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03230
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by K. Scott Stokes. El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by K. Scott Stokes. (Ehrlich, Craig)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/23/19. (aaq)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc. (bdb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by K. Scott Stokes. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8797516) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Porton Mexican Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Scott Stokes
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?