Branigan et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ilse Branigan and Ricky Branigan
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03327
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel and Compliance with Standing Order by John Gregory Godsey on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Godsey, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/27/2020.(Godsey, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Ricky Branigan, Ilse Branigan. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Strott, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order, Certificate of Compliance by Peter Howard Strott on behalf of Ilse Branigan, Ricky Branigan (Strott, Peter)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/19. (bnp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. (bnp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ilse Branigan, Ricky Branigan (Strott, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ricky Branigan and Ilse Branigan. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8810445) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branigan et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilse Branigan
Represented By: Melissa S. Dillon
Represented By: Peter Howard Strott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Branigan
Represented By: Melissa S. Dillon
Represented By: Peter Howard Strott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John Gregory Godsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?