Gottlieb v. Acton et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Gottlieb
Defendant: Peter M. Orser, Brian C. Beazer, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr., Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Allan P. Merrill, Robert L. Salomon, Norma A. Provencio, Peter G. Leemputte and Danny R. Shepherd
Case Number: 1:2019cv03377
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gregory M. Egleston. Clerk to follow-up by 9/30/2019. (pmb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting attorney Thomas James McKenna's #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phillip Gottlieb. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/12/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (bgt)
August 9, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas James McKenna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8844229). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Thomas J. McKenna added appearing on behalf of Phillip Gottlieb (pmb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas James McKenna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8844229). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Phillip Gottlieb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SDNY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Worley, David)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Brian C. Beazer, Peter G. Leemputte, Allan P. Merrill, Peter M. Orser, Norma A. Provencio, Robert L. Salomon, Danny R. Shepherd, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Beazer, #2 Summons Shepherd, #3 Summons Acton, #4 Summons Alpert, #5 Summons Provencio, #6 Summons Leemputte, #7 Summons Orser, #8 Summons Salomon, #9 Summons Zelnak)(tmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb v. Acton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Orser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Beazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth S. Acton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer Homes USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan P. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma A. Provencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter G. Leemputte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny R. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Gottlieb
Represented By: Kristi Stahnke McGregor
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Represented By: David James Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?