United States of America v. $550,328.74 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $550,328.74 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Heil Ginseng, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03379
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 VERIFIED CLAIM by Joe J. Heil on behalf of Heil Ginseng, Inc. as to $550,328.74 in U.S. Currency. (tmf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Mark Hack at Kentucky Address (Smith, Cynthia)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to MHack Enterprises, LLC at Kentucky Address (Smith, Cynthia)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 08/29/2019. (Smith, Cynthia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed on 7/29/2019 for $550,328.74 in United States Currency. (Smith, Cynthia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to MHack Enterprises, LLC (Smith, Cynthia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Mark Hack (Smith, Cynthia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM by United States of America (tmf)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/26/2019. (tmf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $550,328.74 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $550,328.74 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Beckwith Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Heil Ginseng, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?