Johnson-Landry v. J.P. Morgan Chase et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra Johnson-Landry
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase, Other Unknown Persons, US Bank National Association and McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03401
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #22 Order to Show Cause. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - it is ORDERED that, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order, plaintiff pro se must explain to the Court in writing why that Motion should not be granted. The Court will recommend dismissal of this case for want of prosecution if plaintiff pro se does not comply with this Order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); L.R. 41.3(A)(2), N.D. Ga. (The court may, with or without notice to the parties, dismiss a civil case for want of prosecution if... [a] plaintiff... shall, after notice,... fail or refuse to obey a lawful order of the court in the case....).The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/19/19. (klb)
September 16, 2019 Submission of #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Nature of the Action, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jpa)
August 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #21 Order. (klb)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' #19 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. The Court STAYS the discovery period and the parties' obligations to comply with the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) conference, serving initial disclosures, and filing a joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Should the Court later deny Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the parties may commence discovery and shall conduct a Rule 26( f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan within thirty (30) days of the Court's Order denying such motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/30/19. (klb)
August 29, 2019 Clerks Notation re #20 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by J.P. Morgan Chase, US Bank National Association. Read and approved by District Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons by J.P. Morgan Chase, US Bank National Association. (Lewis, Tomiya)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by J.P. Morgan Chase, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Lewis, Tomiya)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Nature of the Action with Brief In Support by J.P. Morgan Chase, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, Tomiya)
August 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #17 Order. (klb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Defendant McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC's Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. The Court stays the discovery period and the parties' obligations to comply with the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) conference, serving initial disclosures, and filing a joint preliminary report & discovery plan. Should the Court later deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, the parties may commence discovery and shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file the joint preliminary report & discovery plan within 30 days of the Court's Order denying such motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/29/19. (klb)
August 29, 2019 Clerks Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Wright, Kimberly)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Kimberly)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Wright, Kimberly)
August 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #13 Order. (klb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Hearing #2 is DENIED. Furthermore, because there are no scheduled legal proceedings, the Request for Postponement #12 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/22/19. (klb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Postponement of Hearings/Legal Proceedings by Cassandra Johnson-Landry. (jpa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Cassandra Johnson-Landry as to the amended complaint. McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (jpa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Cassandra Johnson-Landry. McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (jpa)
August 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #8 Order on Motion to Add Party. (klb)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Add Party and DEEMS the "Amended Nature of the Action" filed as of July 31, 2019. McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC added to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/7/19. (klb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NATURE OF THE ACTION (AMENDED COMPLAINT) against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Johnson-Landry.(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/7/2019 to edit date (klb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Amended Complaint) (klb).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Add Party by Cassandra Johnson-Landry. (jpa)
July 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (adg)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING to rule on #2 Motion for Hearing and #3 Motion to Stay, REFERRING CASE and MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/29/2019. (adg)
July 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #5 Order. (adg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/29/2019. (adg)
July 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cassandra Johnson-Landry re #4 Order of Recusal. (bnw)
July 29, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Hearing, #3 MOTION to Stay, #1 Complaint to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (bnw)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Steve C. Jones recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-03401-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/29/19. (bnw)
July 29, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Hearing, #3 MOTION to Stay, #1 Complaint to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (bnw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Emergency Stay by Cassandra Johnson-Landry. (bnw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Emergency Hearing by Cassandra Johnson-Landry. (bnw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Johnson-Landry.(Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100114418) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson-Landry v. J.P. Morgan Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase
Represented By: Tomiya Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Tomiya Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Johnson-Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?