Cassiopeia IP LLC v. Hisense USA Corporation
Plaintiff: Cassiopeia IP LLC
Defendant: Hisense USA Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03408
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 (Entered in error, attorneys have registered for ECF) Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re Order on #11 and #12 Applications for Admission PHV to Howard L. Wernow and Andrew S. Curfman. (adg) Modified on 9/23/2019 (adg).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension through and including 10/20/2019 for Hisense USA Corporation to file Answer to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/23/2019. (adg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard L. Wernow; and GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice OF Andrew S. Curfman by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on September 18, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
August 29, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Curfman Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Andrew S. Curfman added appearing on behalf of Cassiopeia IP LLC (pmb)
August 29, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard L. Wernow Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Howard L. Wernow added appearing on behalf of Cassiopeia IP LLC (pmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Curfman Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard L. Wernow Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard L. Wernow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8874799). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
August 23, 2019 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Curfman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8874751). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard L. Wernow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8874799). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Curfman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8874751). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 9/20/2019 for Hisense USA Corporation to Answer #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/14/2019. (adg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. Hisense USA Corporation served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/30/19. (rlb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (eop)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hisense USA Corporation. (eop)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8824647) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -U.S. Pat No. 7,322,046, #2 Exhibit -B -Exemplary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassiopeia IP LLC v. Hisense USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hisense USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassiopeia IP LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?