Falcone Global Solutions, LLC v. Forbo Flooring, B.V.
Plaintiff: Falcone Global Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Forbo Flooring, B.V.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03423
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Submission of #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (dob)
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Reagin, Patrick)
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Falcone)(Kaufman, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
July 15, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action. (dob)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/15/2020. (dob)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (adg) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 3, 2020, July 30-31, 2020, September 4, 2020, October 15-16 and 19, 2020, by Patrick Blair Reagin. (Reagin, Patrick)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
May 11, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and #6 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/6/2020. (dob)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Submission of #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Reassign Case. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to the case. The #5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. The #12 Motion to Dismiss remains pending before Judge Cohen. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/29/20. (jpa)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (aaq) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4-6, 2020; March 20, 2020; April 16-20, 2020; August 6, 2020; August 10, 2020, by Patrick Blair Reagin. (Reagin, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Reagin, Patrick)
December 11, 2019 Submission of #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Falcone)(Kaufman, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Reagin, Patrick)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Reagin, Patrick)
November 20, 2019 Submission of #7 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Mark H. Cohen, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Mark H. Cohen filed by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Reagin, Patrick)
November 19, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Falcone)(Kaufman, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Forbo Flooring, B.V., a Dutch Company filed by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC.(Kaufman, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 11/14/2019 to edit who the complaint was filed against. (jpa).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Mark H. Cohen with Brief In Support by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Treco, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forbo Flooring, B.V. identifying Corporate Parent Forbo NL Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Forbo Finanz AG, and Corporate Parent Forbo Holding Ltd. for Forbo Flooring, B.V. (Reagin, Patrick) Modified on 10/31/2019 to add corporate parents (sap).
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Claims, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Bastiaan Janse)(Reagin, Patrick) Modified on 10/29/2019 (sap).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forbo Flooring, B.V.. Forbo Flooring, B.V. waiver mailed on 8/27/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Reagin, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Falcone Capital Holdings, LLC for Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Kaufman, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC re #1 Complaint, of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Kaufman, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Falcone Global Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8826593) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcone Global Solutions, LLC v. Forbo Flooring, B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forbo Flooring, B.V.
Represented By: Patrick Blair Reagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falcone Global Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Dempsey Treco
Represented By: Robert J. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?